Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Dee D Drell
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00345
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:May 14, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
6 6 misc Status Report Thu 05/30 10:35 AM
STATUS REPORT by Sammy Lee Carpenter, III.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/30 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sammy Lee Carpenter, III. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to FCI Phoenix and resent docs. 3 & 4.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
4 4 order Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 05/14 1:58 PM
JUDGMENT adopting3 Report and Recommendations denying and dismissing1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sammy Lee Carpenter, III without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 5/14/2024. (crt,Roaix, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
3 3 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 04/22 1:44 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sammy Lee Carpenter, III - Because Carpenter does not challenge the fact or duration of his confinement, IT IS RECOMMENDED that the § 2241 Petition (ECF No. 1) be DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing an appropriate civil action. Objections to R&R due by 5/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/22/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) (a)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
2 2 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Fri 03/08 1:07 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/8/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 03/07 2:51 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Related [+] filed by Sammy Lee Carpenter, III.(crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-] ceipt number 600000792, filing fee $5.00
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/07 3:05 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]