Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 8:24-cv-00093
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Nola Healthcare, LLC
Plaintiff
Premier Claims, LLC
11010 Burdette St
Omaha, NE 68164
Represented By
Heather S. Voegele-Anson
Voegele, Anson Law Firm
contact info
Andreanna C. Smith
Voegele, Anson Law Firm
contact info

GPO May 14 2024
ORDER - Plaintiff shall filed an amended complaint to properly allege the citizenship of the parties on or before May 31, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)

Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 motion Notice of Case Dismissal Thu 08/22 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney Heather S. Voegele-Anson on behalf of Plaintiff Premier Claims, LLC (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Public Thu 08/22 12:10 PM
Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (JES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/01 2:45 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before August 22, 2024, Plaintiff must show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, or take some other appropriate action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/11 10:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC on 6/10/2024. (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 05/31 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Nola Healthcare. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Requested Fri 05/31 3:03 PM
Summons Requested as to Nola Healthcare, LLC regarding (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/31 2:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC, by Attorney Heather S. Voegele-Anson on behalf of Premier Claims, LLC(Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Tue 05/14 11:22 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff shall filed an amended complaint to properly allege the citizenship of the parties on or before May 31, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/15 1:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC on 4/15/2024. (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 04/05 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Requested Fri 04/05 10:45 AM
Summons Requested as to Nola Healthcare, LLC regarding Complaint1 . (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 04/05 10:27 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC. (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
6 6 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Fri 03/22 11:06 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Heather S. Voegele-Anson on behalf of Plaintiff Premier Claims, LLC.(Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/08 8:29 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Premier Claims, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 8:28 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Nola Healthcare, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 03/08 8:25 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
2 2 service Summons Requested Thu 03/07 4:14 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint1 . (Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nola Healthcare, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5045903), by Attorney Heather S. Voegele-Anson on behalf of Premier Claims, LLC(Voegele-Anson, Heather)
Related: [-]