Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Aileen Goldman Durrett
Case #: 4:24-cv-00207
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Justin Paul
Defendant
Wendy Walker
Plaintiff
Olivia Barnard
Plaintiff
Brad Jester
Plaintiff
Brittany Jester
Plaintiff
Ginger Jester
Plaintiff
Trever Kyle Jester
Plaintiff
Wesley Jester
Plaintiff
Kathleen Lieberman
Plaintiff
Mark Lieberman
Plaintiff
Erika Sprabary
209 Traveller St
Hickory Creek, TX 75065
Plaintiff
Stanton Sprabary


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
25 25 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Thu 06/13 2:19 PM
Interdistrict transfer to the NORTHERN District of OKLAHOMA. (baf)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 06/13 5:30 PM
Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma as case 4:24-cv-00283, filed 06/13/2024. (baf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/23 1:03 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This civil action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma for further disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 5/23/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/23 12:36 PM
ORDER granting21 Plaintiff Kathleen Lieberman's Motion to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 5/23/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 05/23 1:07 PM
The case will be transferred to another district 20 days from the date the Order of Transfer was entered on the docket, per Local Rule CV-83(b). (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
22 22 misc Redacted Document Fri 05/10 1:28 PM
SECOND REDACTION to6 Amended Complaint,10 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,,, by Olivia Barnard, Brad Jester, Brittany Jester, Ginger Jester, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Erika Sprabary, Stanton Sprabary.(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit redacted T.A.J. birth certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit redacted T.A.J. Indian card,
Att: 3 Exhibit redacted UCCJEA 2020 and 2022 to replace document 10, attachment 14,
Att: 4 Exhibit redacted exhibit - 14 DHS referral to replace document number 10, attachments 8 and 9,
Att: 5 Exhibit redacted exhibit - facebook messenger wendy and alex court arrangements to replace document 10, attachment 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit redacted exhibit 15b - PG-2022-640 12-7-22 transcript pg 32 to replace document 10, attachement 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit redacted exhibit 6 - Texas case 18-3808 211 to replace document number 10, attachement 2,
Att: 8 Exhibit redacted exhibit 13 - Texas Order to replace document number 10, attachement 1,
Att: 9 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 1 15-2020 FIRST EMERGENCY Petition for Guardianship,
Att: 10 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 Active Efforts Affidavit,
Att: 11 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 Affidavit - claiming no emergency removal,
Att: 12 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 Case Summary to replace document number 10, attachement 3,
Att: 13 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 Dismissal for Good Cause and ICWA Violations,
Att: 14 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 ICWA Notice,
Att: 15 redacted PG-2020-38 UCCJEA to replace document 10, attachment 13
Monday, April 29, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/29 4:11 PM
MOTION to File Electronically by Kathleen Lieberman. (dlw)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/29 4:10 PM
Notice of Death of Plaintiff, Mark Lieberman, filed by Kathleen Lieberman (dlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
19 19 misc Redacted Document Fri 04/26 12:23 PM
FIRST REDACTION of exhibits by Olivia Barnard, Brad Jester, Brittany Jester, Ginger Jester, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Erika Sprabary, Stanton Sprabary.(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit redacted exhibit 13 - Texas Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit redacted exhibit 6 - Texas case 18-3808 211,
Att: 3 Exhibit redacted PG-2020-38 Case Summary,
Att: 4 Exhibit redacted exhibit 15 - Wendy Walker asking about court
Thursday, April 25, 2024
18 18 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 04/25 2:24 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint,. showing emergency nature of complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) Article regarding cases alledging welsh and Judge Glassco child trafficing,
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) Dustin Brown case against Welsh,
Att: 3 Additional Attachment(s) False statements made on report
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/24 4:23 PM
FIRST NOTICE of death by Olivia Barnard, Brad Jester, Brittany Jester, Ginger Jester, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Erika Sprabary, Stanton Sprabary(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) death certificate
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 04/02 12:46 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. Related case 4:23-CV-00207 .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants incapacity and failure to perform duties in Texas case 18-3808 211,
Att: 2 Text between Alex and Wendy. We will always fight for her too Alexandra.,
Att: 3 Adverse Interest to deprive T.A.J. of the love of her family. Deprived of her mothers memory, not for T.A.J.'s best interest but for the defendants interest.,
Att: 4 ICWA violation of 1911(b)(d), 1912(e), 1915(a),(b)PG-2022-640 Parents and Tribes nominations Not heard,
Att: 5 ICWA violation denial of Fathers petition to transfer to tribe without good cause, break of Indian family,
Att: 6 12 7-2022 Tulsa District Court transcript,
Att: 7 PG-2022-640 motion to correct visitation,
Att: 8 PG-2022-640 motion for removal of guardiansct visitation,
Att: 9 PG-2022-640 transcript 11-2-23,
Att: 10 PG-2022-640 transcript 8-26-2023
14 14 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 04/02 11:40 AM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dog bite injury from defendants dog 3 weeks before falsely filing DHS claim that Alex was harming her child bc she went outside without her shoes on.,
Att: 2 dog bite picture 2,
Att: 3 dog bite picture 3,
Att: 4 dog bite injury scar,
Att: 5 Text between Kathleen Lieberman and Alex Paul regarding dog injury for hearing on 2 11-2020 at the Tulsa District Court,
Att: 6 fb message between Wendy Walker and Alex Paul showing the dog injury after hospital, defendants told Erika Sprabary T.A.J. fell down and busted her head.,
Att: 7 Trever Jester consent for Stanton and Erika Sprabary as guardians,
Att: 8 T.A.J. subjected to defendants domestic violence in home,
Att: 9 Wendy Walker not knowing if T.A.J. remembers her, Alex responds with "she remembers you and Justins fighting", just 8 months before Alex died.,
Att: 10 From Alex's file she left "in case they try to take her again",
Att: 11 Adverse Interest,
Att: 12 2 months after Alex allows Wendy to see T.A.J., Wendys already telling Doctors she "shares" custody with Alex.,
Att: 13 Text between Alex and Brittany Jester regarding Alex's concern with Wendy being inappropriate with T.A.J.,
Att: 14 Pictures from police report showing what T.A.J. packed when she decided to go on porch after spending 2.5 days with her deceased Momma. Several padded bras seems odd for a 4 year old to pack.,
Att: 15 Alex face book post, heartbreaking
Monday, April 01, 2024
13 13 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 7:31 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 timeline 2,
Att: 2 timeline 3,
Att: 3 timeline 4,
Att: 4 timeline 5,
Att: 5 timeline 6,
Att: 6 timeline 7,
Att: 7 timeline 8,
Att: 8 timeline 9,
Att: 9 timeline 10,
Att: 10 timeline 11,
Att: 11 timeline 12,
Att: 12 timeline 13,
Att: 13 timeline 14,
Att: 14 timeline 15,
Att: 15 timeline 16,
Att: 16 timeline 17
12 12 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 7:22 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PG-2022-40 Chickasaw Court Guardianship 9 13-2022
Att: 2 PG-2022-40 Chickasaw Court guardian ad-litem,
Att: 3 defendants trying to get our case dismissed,
Att: 4 brief on ICWA,
Att: 5 notice of hearing on 9-22-22,
Att: 6 order for defendants hearing on 9 15-2022 no notice given to family, father,
Att: 7 Trever Jester emails with defendant's attorney,
Att: 8 Wendy Walkers application for special guardianship (without Justin) falsely claiming she is the childs only family, that the child will be neglected without her (bc she she concealed the death of childs mother from her family)....but she will be filing for social security survior benefits,
Att: 9 UCCJEA, Wendy Walker falesly states the child has lived with her for the last 5 years and omits all crucial family information.,
Att: 10 No service to Father. no diligent effort, or effort at all, a simple phone call to our family would have provided the whereabouts of T.A.Js. father.,
Att: 11 Wendy Walker appointed "special" guardian,
Att: 12 9-15-22, Tulsa Court ignored Tribal Courts appointment of Guardians and the show case hearing just days after and ordered continuance for three months later. ICWA violation,
Att: 13 Liebermans motion to dismiss,
Att: 14 Indian Fathers petition to dismiss and case to remain in tribal court,
Att: 15 Fathers request denied, no good cause,
Att: 16 Tulsa District court proceed against ICWA, father no representation and Tribal Court appointed Guardians and nominations of both parents will not be heard.
11 11 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 6:49 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ICWA affidavit omits all Indian Family and Maternal family,
Att: 2 Active efforts falsely stating T.A.J. has never lived with an Indian Family,
Att: 3 Alex files for expedited hearing,
Att: 4 Tulsa District Court waives ICWA notice requirements,
Att: 5 Alex finally gets to prove her innocence,
Att: 6 Application for attorney fee, Tulsa District Court found no emergency existed, ICWA violations,
Att: 7 Wendy Walker taunts Alex before 10-30-20 hearing, posts picture of her and Justin Paul withT.A.J., her family member comments "Shes your now",
Att: 8 PG-2020-557 Wendy Walker doesnt add parents name to her 2nd peition, drops her 3rd petition,
Att: 9 Alex in hospital 6-2020 beaten down, discouraged and beytrayed. Justin tells her she should go ahead a die (exhibit Carries affidavit),
Att: 10 Alex messages sister in law regarding her fight to get her daughter back,
Att: 11 fb messenger "Justin wants control and Wendy is just obsessed with T.A.J...",
Att: 12 fb messenger - discouraged,
Att: 13 fb messenger - betrayed,
Att: 14 Alexs frustration...guilty until proven innocent,
Att: 15 Time line of T.A.J. residence, including time she was wrongfully detained in Oklahoma
10 10 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 6:13 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Texas order initial custody determination Alex Permanent Conservator 11 12-2019
Att: 2 Texas case 4 9-2018 - 11 12-2019
Att: 3 PG-2020-38 1 15-2020 false emergency guardianship no notice to texas or tribe or father or mother,
Att: 4 Wendy Walker asking Alex about court on 1 9-2020
Att: 5 Wendy Walker claims Alex disappeared while knowing she was in court,
Att: 6 Alex proof she was in Court 1 9-2020 as planned,
Att: 7 phone call proof of 1 15-2020 call to Erika Sprabary after kidnapping T.A.J.,
Att: 8 false DHS claim Wendy Walker files claims DHS approached her despite DHS not knowing who she was,
Att: 9 Evidence that Alex and child were staying at bio father house when Wendy Walker and Justin Paul kidnapped her from crib then claim she lived with them,
Att: 10 Alex facebook post before alleged abandonment,
Att: 11 Wendy Walkers petition claiming child resided with her after taking child,
Att: 12 Defendant claim Texas granted them a guardianship,
Att: 13 UCCJEA 2020 after calling Erika Sprabary asking where child had lived her first two years of life.,
Att: 14 UCCJEA 2020 vs 2022 now child has lived with Wendy Walker for last 5 years,
Att: 15 PG-2020-38 dismissed for good cause, ICWA violation, no background check, no notice
9 9 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 5:54 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Alex Pauls phone last messages calls,
Att: 2 Liebermans provision of phone and service,
Att: 3 Alex electric turned off during T.A.J.s time with deceased mother, turned back on 20 min before discovery, defendants unware,
Att: 4 Vehicle provision for Alex and T.A.J.,
Att: 5 Health Ins. provision until Alex 25,
Att: 6 Alex Paul residence history, Texas drivers license 2021,
Att: 7 Alex residence history, temp Texas license,
Att: 8 Alex residence history, Texas registration 2022,
Att: 9 Alex residence history, Texas registration 2019,
Att: 10 Alex residence history, Texas 2013,
Att: 11 Alex and Lieberman vehicle,
Att: 12 Alex and Lieberman elantra,
Att: 13 Alex and Lieberman Altima, vehicle at time of Alex death,
Att: 14 Alex residence history 2020
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 5:29 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. We are very concerned about the defendants being a flight risk and or emotional harm to the child subject to this case .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Alexandra Hayden Paul Birth certificate,
Att: 2 Don Paul rights given to Mark Lieberman,
Att: 3 Trever Kyle Jester paternity,
Att: 4 affidavit Tanner James Sprabary,
Att: 5 Justin Paul verbal emotional abuse to Alex 1 month in,
Att: 6 Defendants short relationship with minor and her mother,
Att: 7 T.A.J. Texas homestate and benefits,
Att: 8 T.A.J. birth Texas,
Att: 9 Alex Paul Voter registration card,
Att: 10 affidavit Carrie Regan,
Att: 11 Alex Paul written declaration,
Att: 12 Alex emergency contact designating Kathleen Lieberman,
Att: 13 Alex emergency contact texas drivers license app,
Att: 14 Alex emergency contact at T.A.J. school
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/01 4:40 PM
EMERGENCY Additional Attachments to Main Document:6 Amended Complaint. will send other exhibits. .(Sprabary, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit affidavit Ginger Jester,
Att: 2 Exhibit affidavit Brittany Jester
Thursday, March 28, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/02 1:35 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD - INADVERTENTLY FILED IN DUPLICATE BY CLERK*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Justin Paul, Wendy Walker, filed by Mark Lieberman, Ginger Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Brad Jester, Stanton Sprabary, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Erika Sprabary, Brittany Jester.(BAF)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/01 4:33 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Lieberman, Ginger Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Brad Jester, Stanton Sprabary, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Erika Sprabary, Olivia Barnard, Brittany Jester.(RPC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 10, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/11 9:42 AM
ORDER FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before Thursday, March 28, 2024, at 5:00 p.m., pro se Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 3/10/2024. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/08 1:18 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to File electronically. Plaintiffs are hereby approved to file electronic documents on ECF on their own behalf in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 3/8/2024. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/07 5:45 PM
Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAGISTRATE REFERRAL
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/07 5:29 PM
MOTION to Electronically File Pursuant to Rule CV-5(a)(2)(B) by Erika Sprabary. (baf, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 5:24 PM
EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against Justin Paul, Wendy Walker, filed by Mark Lieberman, Ginger Jester, Kathleen Lieberman, Erika Sprabary, Brad Jester, Stanton Sprabary, Trever Kyle Jester, Wesley Jester, Olivia Barnard, Brittany Jester.(baf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USB Drive of Audio and Video Exhibits placed in the Plano Clerk's Office Vault,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Remark Thu 03/07 5:35 PM
USB of Audio and Video Exhibits (EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT) received and placed in the Plano Clerk's Office Vault. (baf, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 03/07 5:57 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, )
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 03/08 9:15 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 6-66710 (wea, 6)
Related: [-]