Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:24-cv-00114
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Washoe County School District
425 East 9th Street
Reno, NV 89512
Represented By
Sara K Montalvo
Washoe County School District
contact info
Andrea L Schulewitch
Washoe County School District
contact info
Plaintiff
H.T.
Represented By
Jean Murrell Adams
Adams, Esq.
contact info
Lyssa E. LeMay
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Torma
Represented By
Lyssa E. LeMay
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Torma
Represented By
Jean Murrell Adams
Adams, Esq.
contact info
Lyssa E. LeMay
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 08, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/08 1:34 PM
ORDER granting26 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED, the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss this matter with prejudice, with each of the Parties to bear their own costs and expenses incurred in this litigation. All other existing dates and deadlines in this matter are hereby vacated. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 8/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
26 26 motion Stipulation Tue 08/06 12:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff H.T.. (Adams, Jean) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 06/26 7:19 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 6/25/2024 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: M. Brown ; Pla Counsel: Jean Adams; Lyssa LeMay; Gloria Torma-Plaintiff ; Def Counsel: Andrea Schulewitch; Sara Montalvo; Joe Erst-Superintendent; Kristen McNeil-Interim Superintendent; Jen Van Tress-Associate Chief, Specialized Instruction; Thomas Wood-Risk Coordinator ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM ; Recording start and end times: 9:05 am - 9:08 am; 11:12 am - 11:18 am ; Courtroom: 3 ; Case settled on the record. Settlement documents are due by 7/25/2024. Stipulation to dismiss action deadline set for 8/9/2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
minord Minute Order Mon 06/17 7:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/17/2024. By Deputy Clerk: AB. The Settlement Conference set for Tuesday, June 25, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (ECF No. 23 ) before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. shall be held by Zoom video conference. The parties are directed to contact the Courtroom Administrator, Ashlyn Bye, at Ashlyn_Bye@nvd.uscourts.gov, by noon on Tuesday, June 18, 2024, to provide the email addresses of all counsel who will be attending the hearing. Instructions and the Zoom invitation will be sent via email prior to the hearing to the participants' email addresses provided to the Court. The following Zoom video conference instructions shall be adhered to as follows: 1. Log on to the Zoom at least ten (10) minutes prior to the hearing time. 2. Mute your sound prior to entering the hearing. 3. Do not talk over one another. 4. State your name prior to speaking for the record. 5. Do not have others in the video screen or moving in the background. 6. No recording of the hearing. 7. No forwarding of any video conference invitations. 8. Unauthorized users on the video conference will be removed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Fri 05/10 11:23 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Zoom Video Settlement Conference) - Settlement Conference set for TUESDAY, JUNE 25, 2024, at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom to be determined before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Clerks Office, 400 South Virginia Street, Room 301, not later than TUESDAY, JUNE 18, 2024, by 4:00 P.M. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 5/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Thu 05/09 10:59 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Case Management Conference held on 5/9/2024 before Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. Crtrm Administrator: AB ; Pla Counsel: Jean Adams & Lyssa LeMay ; Def Counsel: Andrea Schulewitch & Sara Montalvo ; Court Reporter: Liberty ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. ; Recording start and end times: 8:56:49 a.m. - 9:05:21 a.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Report (ECF No. 18 ) and approved the parties' Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 20 ). The Court inquires if counsel would be amenable to referring this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge McQuaid for purposes of settlement. Ms. Schulewitch and Ms. LeMay are amenable. The Court finds that it is appropriate to refer this case to U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. to conduct a settlement conference. Upon inquiry of the Court, Ms. Schulewitch advises that the parties have submitted and are awaiting approval on their Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. Ms. Schulewitch advises the Court of the Defendant's request to bifurcate. Ms. LeMay states her objection. The Court will defer the matter of bifurcation until after the settlement conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
21 21 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 04/23 3:50 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
Related: [-]
20 20 7 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 04/23 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting19 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 04/23 1:08 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Washoe County School District. (Schulewitch, Andrea)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Case Management Report Tue 04/23 1:07 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant Washoe County School District. CONSENT to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge is included in the report. (Schulewitch, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
17 17 6 pgs order Order Wed 04/03 12:43 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set before this Court on THURSDAY, MAY 9, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to contact the courtroom administrator, Karen Walker, at (775) 686-5918 or Karen_Walker@nvd.uscourts.gov, by TUESDAY, MAY 7, 2024 , to provide the e-mail address of all counsel who will be attending the hearing. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report electronically on CM/ECF by 4:00 p.m. on THURSDAY, MAY 2, 2024 . The parties shall file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than THURSDAY, MAY 2, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
16 16 order Standing Order Tue 04/02 11:13 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 04/01 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sara K Montalvo on behalf of Defendant Washoe County School District. (Montalvo, Sara)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 04/01 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Washoe County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schulewitch, Andrea)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/01 2:50 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint,, filed by Washoe County School District. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/11/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2024.(Schulewitch, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Fri 03/29 11:15 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion to appoint Michael Torma and Gloria Torma as guardians ad litem for Plaintiff H.T. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/29/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
misc QC Notice Thu 03/28 10:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiffs. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/11/2024. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
10 10 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 11:37 AM
ORDER APPROVING and GRANTING ECF No.9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jean Murrell Adams for H.T., a minor, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lyssa E. LeMay. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/26/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 03/25 1:02 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jean Murrell Adams and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lyssa LeMay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7628361) by Plaintiff H.T.. (Adams, Jean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
misc QC Notice Wed 03/20 1:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiff. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/27/2024. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/14 4:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.T.. Washoe County School District served on 3/11/2024. (Adams, Jean)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Thu 03/14 4:14 PM
MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Plaintiff Michael Torma. Responses due by 3/28/2024.(Adams, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 7:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County School District. (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/08 7:26 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Fri 03/08 11:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No.1 ,2 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Fri 03/08 11:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Lyssa E. LeMay is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 6:30 PM
COMPLAINT against H.T. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7611265) by H.T.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2024. Proof of service due by 6/5/2024. (Adams, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/07 6:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by H.T.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Jean)
Related: [-]