Alta Vista Gardens, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Deborah J Saltzman |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11780 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Alta Vista Gardens, Inc.
829 N Alta Vista Blvd
Los Angeles, CA 90046-7637 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
misc
Withdrawal re:
Wed 04/24 2:12 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice of Setting/Increasing Insider Compensation Re: Konstantin Goldenberg, with proof of service Filed by Debtor Alta Vista Gardens, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
52 | 52
misc
Amendment - Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)
Mon 04/22 1:17 PM
Amending Schedules (E/F) Fee Amount $34, Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) and Creditor Matrix with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Alta Vista Gardens, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 04/22 1:18 PM
Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-11780-DS] ) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56765085. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
51 | 51
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
Hearing Held . COURT RULING: Status Conference Continued to 7/25/24 at 11:30 a.m. No Status Report Due. (MB2) |
|
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 04/18 3:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Status Hearing to be held on 07/25/2024 at 11:30 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1639 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (MB2) |