Guam District Court
Judge:Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Referred: Michael J Bordallo
Case #: 1:24-cv-00006
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 6:34 PM ChST
Defendant
Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture
Plaintiff
E.M.B. Electrical Inc.
Represented By
Daniel James Berman
Berman, O'Connor And Mann
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM ChST
Friday, March 22, 2024
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice (Other) - Outside users Fri 03/22 10:22 AM
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Berman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed - Outside users Mon 03/11 4:16 PM
Summons Returned Executed Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Berman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Fri 03/08 2:50 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (kbma)
Related: [-]
2 2 37 pgs cmp Complaint - Outside users Fri 03/08 11:18 AM
Complaint for Breach of Contract and to Compel Arbitration against Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by E.M.B. Electrical Inc.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 4/17/2024.(Berman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Cover Sheet Fri 03/08 11:05 AM
Cover Sheet , filed by E.M.B. Electrical Inc..(Berman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 03/08 2:54 PM
Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number 100000282 re2 Complaint. (kbma)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture. (kbma)
Related: [-]