Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:24-cv-00068
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Calhoun, Georgia
Represented By
Jesse Anderson (Andy) Davis
Davis Lucas Carter LLP
contact info
Lee Patterson
Friedman, Dazzio & Zulanas, PC
contact info
Jeffrey E. Friedman
Friedman, Dazzio & Zulanas, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Coosa River Basin Initiative
Represented By
Christopher J. Bowers
Southern Environmental Law Center
contact info
James S. Whitlock
Southern Environmental Law Center
contact info
Robert Hutton Brown
Southern Environmental Law Center
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Moss Land Company, LLC
Terminated: 06/06/2024


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Thursday, October 24, 2024
36 36 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 3:23 PM
FINAL CONSENT DECREE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY OF CALHOUN, GEORGIA: This Consent Decree resolves all claims which were alleged or could have been alleged against Calhoun by CRBI in the Litigation, and all such claims shall be deemed to be dismissed with prejudice. This Consent Decree in no way affects or relieves Calhoun from its responsibility and obligation to comply with Federal, State and local laws or regulations and applicable permits. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/24/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 10/24 12:00 PM
Submission of35 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Decree , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/24 3:29 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/24 12:15 PM
Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Decree by Coosa River Basin Initiative.(Whitlock, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DOJ Ltr of No Objection,
Att: 2 B - Final Consent Decree
Thursday, August 15, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/15 3:35 PM
NOTICE by Coosa River Basin Initiative re31 Notice (Other) Notice of Service of Proposed Consent Decree(Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - DOJ Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - EPA Proof of Service
Thursday, August 08, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/08 12:37 PM
ORDER granting32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. City of Calhoun, Georgia Answer due 9/30/2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/8/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 9:59 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/08 9:33 AM
NOTICE by Coosa River Basin Initiative Joint Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree(Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/10 3:42 PM
ORDER: The Court having read and considered the City of Calhoun, Georgia's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant City of Calhoun, Georgia to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (the "Motion"), and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion and ORDERS that: City of Calhoun, Georgia shall have through and including August 11, 2024, in which to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/10/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 07/09 4:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/11 3:13 PM
ORDER granting26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , City of Calhoun, Georgia Answer due 7/12/2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/11/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
27 27 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/06 4:39 PM
CONSENT DECREE AS TO DEFENDANT MOSS LAND COMPANY, LLC: See document for specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/6/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Thu 06/06 1:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/06 10:27 AM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree21 Notice (Other) by Coosa River Basin Initiative.(Whitlock, James) Modified on 6/6/2024 to remove duplicative text(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DOJ Ltr of No Objection,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Final Consent Decree
Monday, May 13, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/13 10:23 AM
NOTICE by Coosa River Basin Initiative re21 Notice (Other) Notice of Service of Proposed Consent Decree(Whitlock, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- DOJ Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- EPA Proof of Service
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/08 11:15 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, City of Calhoun, Georgia Answer due 6/12/2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/8/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/07 4:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/23 10:16 AM
NOTICE by Coosa River Basin Initiative Joint Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree as to Defendant Moss Land Company LLC(Whitlock, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/15 9:07 AM
ORDER granting18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1(B) for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the application of Lee Patterson to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/15/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/15 9:05 AM
ORDER granting17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1(B) for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the application of Jeff Friedman to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/15/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/10 3:39 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:17 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341703). Attorney Jeffrey E. Friedman added appearing on behalf of City of Calhoun, Georgia. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/10 4:19 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:18 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341718). Attorney Lee Patterson added appearing on behalf of City of Calhoun, Georgia. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
18 18 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 11:27 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice.by City of Calhoun, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 10:40 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice.by City of Calhoun, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Mon 04/08 4:42 PM
RETURN of15 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341703). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Please use the updated PHV application located on our website (djs)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Mon 04/08 4:44 PM
RETURN of16 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341718). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Please use the updated PHV application located on our website (djs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
16 16 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/05 10:50 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341718).by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13341703).by City of Calhoun, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/05 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Anderson (Andy) Davis on behalf of City of Calhoun, Georgia (Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/21 9:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Calhoun, Georgia. City of Calhoun, Georgia waiver mailed on 3/12/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Davis, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/20 3:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Moss Land Company, LLC. Moss Land Company, LLC waiver mailed on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Causby, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 3:43 PM
ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.l(B) for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the application of James Smarr Whitlock to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/18/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/12 10:15 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Calhoun, Georgia. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 service Proposed Summons Mon 03/11 5:09 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative to City of Calhoun, Georgia, c/o James F. Palmer, Mayor (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 03/11 9:34 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Moss Land Company, LLC. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/08 3:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coosa River Basin Initiative. (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Fri 03/08 10:01 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative to Moss Land Company, LLC, c/o William M. Moss (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/08 3:20 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of James Smarr Whitlock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13275852). Attorney James S. Whitlock added appearing on behalf of Coosa River Basin Initiative. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/07 3:37 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of James Smarr Whitlock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13275852).by Coosa River Basin Initiative. (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/07 1:18 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative to William M. Moss, Moss Land Company (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 03/07 1:13 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative to James F. Palmer Mayor City of Calhoun (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter re:83.1 Thu 03/07 11:31 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to James S. Whitlock. Clerk to follow-up by 3/18/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13273941)(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - CWA/RCRA Notice to Calhoun,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - CWA/RCRA Notice to Moss Land Company,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Supplemental CWA Notice to Calhoun,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet