Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 2:24-cv-01004
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
GREGORY ALLARD
Represented By
JEFFREY H. QUINN
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, PC
contact info
ARIEL MCKEEVER
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Defendant
WATSON AND ALLARD P.C.
24 Regency Plaza, Glen Mills, PA 19342
Glenn Mills, PA 19342
Represented By
JEFFREY H. QUINN
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, PC
contact info
ARIEL MCKEEVER
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Defendant
J. SCOTT WATSON
Represented By
JEFFREY H. QUINN
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, PC
contact info
ARIEL MCKEEVER
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Plaintiff
KEHALI ABAY
Represented By
PREDRAG FILIPOVIC
Stopripoff.Com Law Office Of Predrag Filipovic
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON PERRY on behalf of GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C. (PERRY, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 03/11 10:45 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS14 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; AS OUTLINED HEREIN... SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 3/11/25.3/11/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 09/04 11:20 AM
RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C.. (QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 08/28 1:24 PM
ORDER granting16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS FROM THE DAY OF THIS ORDER TO FILE SAID REPLY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 8/28/24.8/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Mon 07/15 10:28 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE WAIVER OF SERVICE10 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 7/15/24.7/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Fri 06/14 11:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Judgment on Pleadings filed by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C..Certificate of Service.(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/11 12:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion(s) filed by KEHALI ABAY.(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 05/28 12:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C..Brief, Certificate of Service.(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
13 13 adr Consent to Arbitration Tue 05/14 2:03 PM
CONSENT to Arbitration by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C.(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference Tue 05/14 2:00 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference Mon 05/13 11:00 AM
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference.(rv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 motion Strike Thu 05/09 9:46 AM
MOTION to Strike Waiver of Service filed by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C..Certificate of Service.(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 2:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C..(QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/26 12:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Johnathan J. Dibello re: served A separate copy of Complaint and Summons for each Defendant named upon J.Scott Watson, Greggory Allard, Watson&Allard P.C. by personolly serving Laura Shultz as indicated, person in charge of Defs' primary place of business by Personal Service on April 8th 2024 (FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/24 3:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGORY ALLARD, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C., J. SCOTT WATSON. GREGORY ALLARD waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; WATSON AND ALLARD P.C. waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; J. SCOTT WATSON waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY H. QUINN on behalf of GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C. (QUINN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/23 3:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C.. (MCKEEVER, ARIEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARIEL MCKEEVER on behalf of GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C. (MCKEEVER, ARIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to GREGORY ALLARD, J. SCOTT WATSON, WATSON AND ALLARD P.C.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/8/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/08 11:52 AM
NOTICE by KEHALI ABAY re1 Complaint (Attorney), Designation Form and Civil Cover sheet(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Attorney Required Forms Fri 03/08 9:23 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box is not checked off. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 03/07 8:38 PM
COMPLAINT by Kehal Abay against J Scott Watson and against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17314659.), filed by Abay Kehali.(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Designation Form