South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 2:24-cv-01138
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Rockbridge Capital, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Travis Smith
Collins And Lacy (col)
contact info
Christian Stegmaier
Collins And Lacy
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanne Richman
Represented By
Michael Anthony Melonakos
The Melonakos Law Firm LLC
contact info
Ryan Patrick Alderson
The Melonakos Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/31 12:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Rockbridge Capital, LLC. (Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/22 10:00 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 2/3/2025, Motions due by 3/6/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 6/4/2025, Mediation Due by 2/3/2025. (Motions terminated: 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by Rockbridge Capital, LLC) Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/22/2024. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Mon 10/21 3:20 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Motions,, by Rockbridge Capital, LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
21 21 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Thu 10/10 9:34 AM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Joanne Richman.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
20 20 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Fri 09/06 1:05 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Stegmaier, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
19 19 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 08/05 10:26 AM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Joanne Richman.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 12:38 PM
CONSENT DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/20/2024. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
17 17 order Confidentiality Order Wed 04/24 1:58 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 04/24/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/10 2:32 PM
AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/6/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/5/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/6/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/6/2024, Discovery due by 11/5/2024, Motions due by 12/6/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 3/6/2025, Mediation Due by 11/5/2024. (Motions terminated: 15 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Scheduling Order, filed by Rockbridge Capital, LLC ). Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 04/10/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/08 3:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Scheduling Order,, by Rockbridge Capital, LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
14 14 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/04 5:21 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Confidentiality Order Thu 04/04 5:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Rockbridge Capital, LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 04/04 5:17 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 04/04 5:11 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/02 1:30 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Stegmaier, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/20 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joanne Richman re8 Amended Complaint (Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/20 9:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rockbridge Capital, LLC, filed by Joanne Richman. Service due by 6/18/2024 (Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 03/20 9:32 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joanne Richman.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 order Mediation Order Tue 03/12 10:41 AM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 9/6/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 03/12/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/12 10:40 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/2/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/16/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 4/16/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/7/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/6/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/8/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/8/2024, Discovery due by 9/6/2024, Motions due by 10/7/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 1/6/2025, Mediation Due by 9/6/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 03/12/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/11 4:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(Stegmaier, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/07 9:51 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/07 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP1000461. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11631485), filed by Rockbridge Capital, LLC.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents