Three Star Farms, LLC
Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Denise E Barnett |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-21085 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Three Star Farms, LLC
751 Bullman Rd
Finger, TN 38334-2815 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 12:03 PM CDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 04/12 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
57 | 57
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 04/12 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Thu 04/11 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
order
Closing Transferred Case (Ch 7 or 11 only)
Wed 04/10 10:22 AM
Order Administratively Closing Case, which was previously transferred to the Western District of TN, Eastern Division. (ana) |
|
54 | 54
court
Receipt for Bk Transfer
Wed 04/10 10:20 AM
Receipt of Case that was Transferred to the Western District of Tennessee, Eastern Division, Received a Case Number Assignment of 24-10463 (ana) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
misc
Certificate Of Service (Use For Jackson Cases)
Tue 04/09 4:22 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Debtor Three Star Farms, LLC . (Geno, Craig) |
|
52 | 52
misc
Pre Status Conference Report (Ch 11 Subchapter V)
Tue 04/09 4:20 PM
Pre Status Conference Report Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Debtor Three Star Farms, LLC. (Geno, Craig) |
|
51 | 51
court
Letter Of Transmittal Re: Change Of Venue (Outgoing Transfer ONLY)
Tue 04/09 4:02 PM
Letter of Transmittal Re: Change of Venue for case 24-21085 to Jackson - Western District of TN, Eastern Division (ana) |
|
50 | 50
2
pgs
order
Order On Motion To Change Venue / Transfer Bankruptcy Case
Tue 04/09 4:01 PM
Order Granting Motion To Change Venue/Transfer Bankruptcy Case Filed By Centennial Bank (ana) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 04/05 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.) |