Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-05857
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2024 12:50 AM MST
Defendant
Elmer Villalobos-Zazueta (1)
Represented By
Nancy Janeth Arce
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah Bullard Houston
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/14/2024 11:58 AM MST
Saturday, March 02, 2024
Arrest of Elmer Villalobos-Zazueta on 3/2/2024. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Elmer Villalobos-Zazueta. (SIB)
Related: [-]