Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-20112
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2024 2:57 AM EST
Defendant
Kenyatta Sellers (1)
Represented By
Celeste Kinney
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Andrew Densemo
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Ranya Elzein
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Oct 29 2024
OPINION & ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT KENYATTA SELLERS'S 18 MOTION TO REVOKE THE DETENTION ORDER - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)

Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 4:26 AM EST
Friday, February 23, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Initial Appearance as to Kenyatta Sellers held on 2/23/2024. Detention Hearing set for 2/27/2024 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Natasha Webster) (AUSA: Tare Wigod) (KBro) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford as to Kenyatta Sellers (1). (KBro) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Kenyatta Sellers held on 02/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (2.0 MB) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Kenyatta Sellers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Kenyatta Sellers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kenyatta Sellers Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Densemo appearing for Kenyatta Sellers (Densemo, Andrew) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Celeste Kinney appearing for Kenyatta Sellers . (Kinney, Celeste) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: Detention Hearing as to Kenyatta Sellers held on 2/27/2024. Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. Preliminary Examination set for 3/8/2024 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Unassigned .(Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Celeste Kinney and Andrew Densemo) (AUSA: Ranya Elzein) (LHos) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Kenyatta Sellers held on 2/27/2024 before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. AUDIO FILE SIZE (30.3 MB) (KBro) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Kenyatta Sellers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (LHos) [2:24-mj-30068-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
11 11 [DOCKETED ON WRONG CASE] ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kenyatta Sellers Time excluded from 3/8/2024 until 5/8/2024. Preliminary Examination adjourned to 5/8/2024 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)[2:24-mj-30068-DUTY] (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/7/2024) (EBut). Modified on 3/7/2024 (EBut).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 INDICTMENT as to Kenyatta Sellers (1) count(s) 1. (TTho)
Related: [-]