Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00134
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Antonio Castro-Martinez (1)
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jeffery Dalton Slatton
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 2:31 AM CST
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
1 1 INFORMATION as to Antonio Castro-Martinez (1) count(s) 1. (ms)
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Docket Call as to Antonio Castro-Martinez held on 3/6/2024; Dft. failed to appear. Arrest Warrant issued. (Tape #10:40:50.) (ms)
Related: [-]