Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00073
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2024 12:35 AM MST
Defendant
Alford J. Hicks (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samuel S. Pead
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 1:52 AM MST
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
Case unsealed as to Alford J. Hicks. (dle)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Alford J. Hicks (1) count(s) 1. Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. (dle) Modified by editing docket text on 3/6/2024 (dle).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING IN-PERSON HEARING OR TRIAL as to Alford J. Hicks Initial App./Arraignment set for 3/11/2024 at 01:15 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 3/6/24.(ksm)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Alford J. Hicks. (dle)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Alford J. Hicks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 3/6/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF Unsealing Criminal Case as to Alford J. Hicks. (dle)
Related: [-]