Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-bcaag-01547
Typebca or pto / patent trial and appeal board
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 8:43 AM EST
Thursday, March 07, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/06/2024. [989112] Fee is due on 03/21/2024. Entry of Appearance is due on 03/21/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/21/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 03/21/2024. Certified List is due on 04/16/2024. [JSP] [Entered: 03/07/2024 02:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 51 pgs Agency Case Docketed