Hurtado v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-md-02846
Lead case: 2:18-md-02846
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01090 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 7:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
C.R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Davol, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hurtado
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/29 11:29 AM
Short Form ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
Saturday, March 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Sat 03/09 11:31 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mark Hurtado. (Fantini, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/08 12:02 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9856570), filed by Mark Hurtado. (Fantini, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |