New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:24-cv-01784
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Gretchen Scott, LLC
Represented By
Scott Dewitt Piper
Harris Beach Pllc(roch)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/09 4:52 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Gretchen Scott, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jessica Karim. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Wed 06/26 11:39 AM
ORDER It has been reported to the Court that this case has been settled in principle. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. Any application to reopen this action must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order, and any application filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and so ordered by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/25 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Gretchen Scott, LLC..(Piper, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 05/24 1:32 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Per the parties' request, the conference will take place telephonically. Call-in Number: (888) 363 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/24/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Thu 05/23 6:11 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gabriel A. Levy dated 5/23/24 re: Response to Order (Doc. 6). Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/15 3:00 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Scott D. Piper dated 5/13/2024.,1 Complaint. Gretchen Scott, LLC answer due 6/13/2024. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/15/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/13 11:01 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Scott D. Piper dated 5/13/2024. Document filed by Gretchen Scott, LLC..(Piper, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/12 11:25 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Scott D. Piper dated 4/12/2024.,1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Gretchen Scott, LLC answer due 5/14/2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/12/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/12 10:09 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Scott D. Piper dated 4/12/2024. Document filed by Gretchen Scott, LLC..(Piper, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/12 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Dewitt Piper on behalf of Gretchen Scott, LLC..(Piper, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/26 2:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Gretchen Scott, LLC served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. Service was accepted by Lloyd Buchanan. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 4:30 PM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/13/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gretchen Scott, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/11 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/11 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/11 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
4 4 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Fri 03/08 11:39 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 11:38 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gretchen Scott, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/08 11:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Gretchen Scott, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29053142)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]