New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:24-cv-01785
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
George Latimer
Westchester County Executive 148 Martine Avenue
White Plains, NY 10514
Represented By
Irma Wheatfield Cosgriff
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Corinne Pascariu-Costo
Represented By
James Roland Costo
Law Office Of James Costo
contact info
Defendant
Terrance Raynor
Acting Commissioner-Sheriff, 148 Martine Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Irma Wheatfield Cosgriff
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Westchester County
Represented By
Irma Wheatfield Cosgriff
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Westchester County Department of Public Safety
Represented By
Irma Wheatfield Cosgriff
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Saetta
Represented By
Peter E. Brill
Brill Legal Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
36 36 8 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/29 3:07 PM
AMENDED OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amendment claims, state law claims for violations of New York Civil Service Law 75-B, defamation, defamation per se, and interference with business relations without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by May 30, 2025. Plaintiff is advised that the Amended Complaint will replace, not supplement, the Complaint, and so any claims that he wishes to pursue must be included in, or attached to, the Amended Complaint. Should Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint, the Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond by June 23, 2025, and the parties are directed to complete and file a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached) by July 21, 2025. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time allowed, those claims that were dismissed without prejudice shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 26. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/29/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Memo Endorsement Tue 04/29 11:59 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:34 Letter filed by Joseph Saetta. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will issue an Amended Opinion and Order; the parties are directed to adhere to the deadlines set forth in the Original Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/29/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Fri 04/25 10:12 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Peter E. Brill dated April 25, 2025 re: Clarification of Court's Order of April 25. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 9:41 AM
OPINION & ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Defendants' motion to dismiss pro se Plaintiff's First Amendment claims, state law claims for violations of New York Civil Service Law 75-B, defamation, defamation per se, and interference with business relations without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by May 30, 2025. Plaintiff is advised that the Amended Complaint will replace, not supplement, the Complaint, and so any claims that he wishes to pursue must be included in, or attached to, the Amended Complaint. Should Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint, the Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond by June 23, 2025, and the parties are directed to complete and file a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached) by July 21, 2025. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time allowed, those claims that were dismissed without prejudice shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 26. SO ORDERED:, ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/24/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
32 32 respm Affirmation in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/05 5:43 PM
AFFIRMATION of Peter E. Brill in Opposition re:26 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 09/05 5:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of MOL, NOM, Declaration and Exhibit A served on James Costo on 6 27-2024 Service was made by Mail. Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 09/05 5:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of MOL, NOM, Declaration and Exhibit A served on Peter Brill on 6 27-2024 Service was made by Mail. Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 5:12 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:26 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
28 28 22 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 5:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:26 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 5:11 PM
DECLARATION of Irma Cosgriff in Support re:26 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 5:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 08/14 2:53 PM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. County Defendants request is GRANTED. The deadline for the Defendants to file their reply and all parties to file their motion papers September 5, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 9/5/2024. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/14/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/14 2:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 9/5/2024. (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/13 5:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time . Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/24 10:19 AM
ORDER granting22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Pltf.'s request, consented to by the County Defendants, is GRANTED. Pltf. is to serve, not file, his opposition on August 1, 2024. County Defs. are directed to serve their reply, and the parties are to file their papers, on August 21, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 8/21/2024 Replies due by 8/21/2024. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/23/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/23 3:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on Consent addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Peter E. Brill dated July 23, 2024. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/31 3:21 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The County Defs. request, consented to by Pltf., is GRANTED. The briefing schedule is revised as follows: (1) the County Defs. are to serve, not file, their motion papers on June 27, 2024; (2) Pltf. is to serve, not file, his opposition on July 23, 2024; and (3) the County Defs. are to serve their reply, and the parties are to file their papers, on August 14, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 20. Motions due by 8/14/2024. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/31/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/31 12:59 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Irma Cosgriff dated 05 31-2024 Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/31 3:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/14/2024 Replies due by 8/14/2024. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
19 19 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Mon 04/22 12:21 PM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Conference re:17 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Irma Cosgriff dated 04 11-2024 The Court is in receipt of the attached Letter from Terrence Raynor, Westchester County Department of Public Safety, and Westchester County ("County Defendants"), dated April 11, 2024, seeking leave to file a Motion to Dismiss. The Court is further in receipt of the Letter response, also attached, from Plaintiff, dated April 15, 2024. The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement and grants the County Defendants leave to file a Motion to Dismiss in accordance with the following briefing schedule: (1) County Defendants' moving papers are to be served (not filed) on June 6, 2024; (2) Plaintiff's opposition papers are to be served (not filed) on July 8, 2024; and (3) County Defendants' reply papers are to be served on July 23, 2024. All motion papers are to be filed by the parties on the reply date, July 23, 2024. The parties are directed to provide Chambers with two physical courtesy copies of their motion papers on the same date they are served on opposing counsel. The parties are further directed to provide the Court with an electronic courtesy copy of the motion papers as they are served per this Court's local emergency civil rules. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 17. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/22/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/14 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/23/2024. (ate)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 04/15 5:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Peter E. Brill dated April, 15, 2024 re: Responding to Westchester County Defendants' Request for a conference and/or permission to file a motion to dismiss. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit to Article 78 proceeding
Thursday, April 11, 2024
17 17 motion Conference Thu 04/11 5:40 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Irma Cosgriff dated 04 11-2024 Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Roland Costo on behalf of Corinne Pascariu-Costo..(Costo, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
15 15 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/03 3:29 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Letter filed by Terrance Raynor, Westchester County Department of Public Safety, ENDORSEMENT: The County Defs. request is GRANTED. The County Defs. are directed to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 11, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/3/2024) Westchester County, George Latimer, George Latimer answer due 4/11/2024; Terrance Raynor answer due 4/11/2024; Westchester County answer due 4/11/2024; Westchester County Department of Public Safety answer due 4/11/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Tue 04/02 5:21 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Irma Cosgriff dated 04 02-2024 re: Extension. Document filed by George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irma Wheatfield Cosgriff on behalf of George Latimer, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(Cosgriff, Irma)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester County..(pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester County Department of Public Safety..(pc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corinne Pascariu-Costo..(pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Latimer..(pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terrance Raynor..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/11 11:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/11 11:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/11 11:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/11 11:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter E. Brill. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/11 11:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter E. Brill. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Terrance Raynor, George Latimer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/11 1:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter E. Brill. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Westchester Department of Public Safety. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 12:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corinne Pascariu-Costo, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 12:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westchester County, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 12:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westchester Department of Public Safety, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 12:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Latimer, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 12:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Terrance Raynor, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/08 11:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against George Latimer, Corinne Pascariu-Costo, Terrance Raynor, Westchester County, Westchester Department of Public Safety. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29053202)Document filed by Joseph Saetta..(Brill, Peter)
Related: [-]