Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00222

District Of Columbia Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth L Gunn
Case #: 1:24-ap-10008
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Allison Paul
800 4th Street, NW Unit S120
Washington, DC 20024
Represented By
Allison Paul
contact info
Plaintiff
Lessard Design, Inc.
8521 Leesburg Pike Suite 700
Vienna, VA 22182
Represented By
Stephen K. Gallagher
Venable, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 court Hearing - Held (AP) Tue 05/21 4:58 PM
Minute Entry RE: Hearing Held (AP) Related [+] Appearances: Stephen Gallagher, Philip McNutt. Motion to Dismiss Under Advisement. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:4 Summons Issued,9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding.
Thursday, May 16, 2024
14 14 court Hearing - Scheduled (BK) Thu 05/16 12:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 02:00 PM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact aimee_mathewes@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, May 10, 2024
13 13 answer Reply Fri 05/10 6:57 PM
Reply of the Debtor to the Opposition of Lessard, Inc. to the Debtor's Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Allison Paul Related [+] (McNutt, Philip). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Modified on 5/13/2024 TO ADD LINKAGE. (Alde, Claude)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,11 Opposition.
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 court Hearing - Continued (BK) Thu 05/09 2:47 PM
Minute Entry RE: Hearing Continued Related [+] No Appearances. Status Hearing to be held on 5/21/2024 at 02:00 PM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact aimee_mathewes@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 answer Opposition Fri 05/03 5:26 PM
Opposition Filed by Lessard Design, Inc. Related [+] (Gallagher, Stephen)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 19, 2024
10 10 notice Opportunity to Object (Correction) Fri 04/19 11:26 AM
Notice of Opportunity to Object (Amended) ti Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Allison Paul Related [+] Objections due by 5/3/2024. (McNutt, Philip)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding.
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/18 3:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Allison Paul (McNutt, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/11 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion
Monday, April 08, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Mon 04/08 2:21 PM
Order Granting the Defendant's Motion for an Extension of the Deadline for Filing an Answer or Other Response to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+] Entered on 4/8/2024. (Alde, Claude)
Related: [-] :6
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 motion Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES) Wed 04/03 10:32 AM
Motion to Extend the Defendant's Deadline to Respond or Answer the Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Allison Paul Related [+] (McNutt, Philip)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:1 Complaint,5 Summons Service Executed.
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting an Extension of the Deadline for the Defendant to Answer or Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint
Friday, March 15, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons - Service Executed Fri 03/15 9:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on Allison Paul 3/13/2024 (Gallagher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 03/08 12:55 PM
Summons Issued on Allison Paul . Number of Summons Issued: 1. Answer due by: 4/8/2024. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. Status Hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact aimee_mathewes@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
3 3 misc Draft Summons Thu 03/07 5:57 PM
Draft Summons Related [+] (Gallagher, Stephen)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:1 Complaint.
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI) Thu 03/07 5:49 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-10008 ELG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt numberA2727200. Fee Amount 350.00 (Gallagher, Stephen) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 5:46 PM
Adversary case 24-10008 Complaint by Lessard Design, Inc., Allison Paul against Allison Paul. (Fee Amount of $350) (COMPLAINT TO DENY DEBTORS DISCHARGE, TO DECLARE DEBT NONDISCHARGEABLE, OR TO DISMISS CHAPTER 7 CASE) . (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Gallagher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons
Att: 4 Rule 7001 Corporate Ownership Statement