Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Sala
Case #: 2:24-bk-01730
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
INDEPENDENCE PLUS, INC., an Arizona nonprofit corporation
3150 N 35th Ave Ste 2
Phoenix, AZ 85017-5272
Represented By
LINDSI M. WEBER
The Burgess Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Monday, July 01, 2024
90 90 order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Mon 07/01 4:15 PM
Final Decree (Case Closed) signed on 7/1/2024 Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 83 Notice of Filing
89 89 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 07/01 2:34 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Request For Entry Of Final Decree Closing Case filed by LINDSI M. WEBER of THE BURGESS LAW GROUP on behalf of INDEPENDENCE PLUS, INC. Related [+].(WEBER, LINDSI)
Related: [-] 83 Notice of Filing
88 88 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Mon 07/01 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service and No Objections Re Notice Of: (1) Substantial Consummation Of Plan; (2) Certification That All Distributions Have Been Made; And (3) Request For Entry Of Final Decree Closing Case filed by LINDSI M. WEBER of THE BURGESS LAW GROUP on behalf of INDEPENDENCE PLUS, INC.. Related [+] (WEBER, LINDSI)
Related: [-] 83 Notice of Filing,84 Notice of Bar Date
87 87 other Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 07/01 1:41 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2024 filed by LINDSI M. WEBER of THE BURGESS LAW GROUP on behalf of INDEPENDENCE PLUS, INC.. (WEBER, LINDSI)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
86 86 trustee Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution D-consensual plan consummated, fee award recd Fri 06/28 3:32 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 4 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $114980.13, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $194604.37, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $194604.37. filed by JAMES E. CROSS of Cross Law Firm, PLC on behalf of JAMES E. CROSS.(CROSS, JAMES)
Related: [-]