California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:24-bk-11787
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024

Debtor
Mad Tuna Inc
27540 Sierra Hwy
Canyon Country, CA 91351-3088
Represented By
Jaime A Cuevas, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jaime A. Cuevas, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Carolyn A Dye (TR)
Law Offices of Carolyn Dye 15030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 527
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 12:05 PM PST
Friday, March 08, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 03/08 10:51 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-11787] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56588370. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 03/08 10:47 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Mad Tuna Inc Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/22/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/22/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/22/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/22/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/22/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/22/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/22/2024. (Cuevas, Jaime)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 03/08 11:05 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/2/2024 at 10:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]