California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-01895
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Christine Agrusa
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Michael J. Fluhr
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kenvue, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Christine Agrusa
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Michael J. Fluhr
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra Donato
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayleigh Schneider
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Saavedra
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jenny Qu
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Powers
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Morgan
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah Long
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Long
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie LaMay
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Starnella Harder
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Feldtkeller
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verunika Dujmovic
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Medina
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Corey
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Johne Conte
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Calzado
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdallah Al-Qudsi
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Montenegro
Represented By
Stephanie B Sherman
Wisner Baum LLP
contact info
R. Brent Wisner
Wisner Baum, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
61 61 misc Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 09/19 11:35 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of New Jersey, 3:24-cv-09226 filed 9/17/2024. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
60 60 order Transfer Case Mon 09/16 4:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE20 46 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court finds that the interest of justice would be best served by transferring the case to New Jersey so that defendant- specific cases can be consolidated. The benefits of judicial economy weigh in favor of transfer, and no factor weighs heavily against it, with most factors either being neutral or tipping slightly in one direction or another. Accordingly, the motion is granted, and the case is transferred to the U.S. District Court of New Jersey. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (rolm)
Related: [-]
59 59 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 09/16 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/13/24 10:18 a.m. re Transcript58 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha)
Related: [-]
58 58 transcript -Transcript Mon 09/16 3:53 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/13/24 10:18 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2024. (ha)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
57 57 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 09/16 3:34 PM
MINUTES of Motion to Stay Discovery; Motion to Transfer; Motion to Dismiss; Mandatory Scheduling Conference; Status Conference by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Case called and appearances made. The Court heard argument from counsel on its tentative rulings on Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Inc. and Kenvue, Inc.'s motion to transfer, and Defendants Alchemee, LLC and Taro Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.'s motion to dismiss, which addressed issues raised in the other Defendants' motions to dismiss. The Court took the matters under submission. If necessary, the Court will issue a separate order continuing the mandatory scheduling conference. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
56 56 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 09/12 1:44 PM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court has posted on its webpage a tentative ruling on the motion to transfer venue in this action, as well as a tentative ruling on the motion to dismiss in the related case, Howard v. Alchemee, LLC, No. 2:24-CV-01834-SB, that addresses issues raised in the motion to dismiss in this action. The parties are ordered to review the tentative rulings and be prepared to address them at the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bk)
Related: [-]
55 55 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 09/12 10:21 AM
PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 filed by Plaintiffs Abdallah Al-Qudsi, Daniel Calzado, Johne Conte, Robin Corey, Alexandra Donato, Verunika Dujmovic, Daniel Feldtkeller, Starnella Harder, Leslie LaMay, Joseph Long, Noah Long, Melissa Medina, Alan Montenegro, Brenda Morgan, Cheryl Powers, Jenny Qu, Marilyn Saavedra, Kayleigh Schneider. (Sherman, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
54 54 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/11 4:29 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Kenvue Inc.s Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Kenvue, Inc..(Agrusa, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2024-08-28 FDA Response to Valisure Citizen Petition
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
53 53 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/10 12:37 PM
Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Kenvue Inc. filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Kenvue, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela)
Related: [-]
52 52 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/10 9:45 AM
(In Chambers) Order re Lead Counsel Designation by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: As directed in the Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases, only one attorney for each party may be designated as lead counsel. Lead counsel must attend all proceedings set by this Court and must be prepared to address and resolve all matters within the scope of the proceeding. Defendants have multiple attorneys but have failed to designate lead counsel. Counsel for Defendants are directed to update the docket to comply with the Court's requirement by no later than noon on September 12, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]