California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-01896
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Fair Oaks Car Wash LLC
Defendant
Izabella Keosyan
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jardine Gougis
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 05/23 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/07 7:05 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING OSC RE DISMISSAL by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the parties' Notice of Settlement (Dkt.16 ), an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal is set for June 17, 2024. On or before June 10, 2024, the parties shall file either a joint status report or a request for dismissal. If the parties file a request for dismissal by June 10, 2024, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (grr)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Settlement Tue 05/07 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 11:18 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO FAIR OAKS CAR WASH LLC AND IZABELLA KEOSYAN by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than May 7, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses as to Fair Oaks Car Wash LLC and Izabella Keosyan. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an amended application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/04 12:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis, upon Defendant Izabella Keosyan served on 4/1/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Izabella Keosyan, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/04 11:58 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis, upon Defendant Fair Oaks Car Wash LLC served on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 04/02 3:50 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs causes of action for alleged violations of the Unruh Act, California Disabled Persons Act, and California Health and Safety Code and cause of action for negligence are DISMISSED; provided, however, this Order is stayed for 21 days following its entry so that Plaintiff may refile these state law claims in an appropriate Superior Court while they remain pending here. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
11 11 misc Response Thu 03/28 3:40 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougisto Order to Show Cause10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, March 11, 2024
10 10 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/11 12:27 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER STATE-LAW CLAIMS by Judge John A. Kronstadt. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/28/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/11 9:18 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/08 5:02 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Fair Oaks Car Wash LLC, Izabella Keosyan. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/08 5:01 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/08 5:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/08 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/08 12:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/08 12:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/08 12:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/08 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-37058347 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jardine Gougis(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]