Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:24-cv-01022
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
ADDSHOPPERS, INC.
Represented By
SARAH E. MEYER
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
JEFFREY A. TOPOR
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
TOMIO B. NARITA
Womble Bond Dickinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
NUTRISYSTEM, INC.
Represented By
ARI N. ROTHMAN
Venable LLP
contact info
JOSEPH E. WOLFSON
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Jane B. Baber
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
VIVINT, INC.
Represented By
Tara Rice
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Kevin L. Colosimo
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Casey Wood Hensley
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
D. CHRISTOPHER ROBINSON
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMELIA INGRAO
Represented By
KASEY A. YOUNGENTOB
Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP
contact info
NORMAN E. SIEGEL
Stueve And Siegal, LLP
contact info
J. AUSTIN MOORE
Stueve Siegel Hanson
contact info
CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
Plaintiff
ELISABETH PACANA
Represented By
KASEY A. YOUNGENTOB
Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP
contact info
NORMAN E. SIEGEL
Stueve And Siegal, LLP
contact info
J. AUSTIN MOORE
Stueve Siegel Hanson
contact info
CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info

GPO Nov 25 2024
OPINION SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/25/24. 11/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
GPO Nov 25 2024
ORDER GRANTING 25 26 31 MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/25/24. 11/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
73 73 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/26 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING25 26 31 MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/25/24. 11/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
72 72 34 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 11/26 8:55 AM
OPINION SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/25/24. 11/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]