California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: Steve B Chu
Case #: 3:24-cv-00458
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983vp Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Judge Daniel Segura
Represented By
Carmela E. Duke
Superior Court Of California, County Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
Marian Anthony
10212 Lilac Ridge Rd.
Escondido, CA 92026

GPO Mar 11 2024
ORDER Denying Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 1) Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 03/11/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
GPO Apr 04 2024
ce)(mjw)Order: 1.Terminating as Moot Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.7); and2.Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Electronically (ECF No.10). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 04/03/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Servi
GPO Jul 03 2024
ORDER Granting with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 13). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 07/03/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
23 23 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 07/05 8:15 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is The Court grants Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 13). The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE this action. This case is hereby closed.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
22 22 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/05 8:11 AM
ORDER Granting with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (ECF No.13 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 07/03/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
21 21 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Tue 05/21 2:50 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting re20 Response - Other, from Plaintiff Marian Anthony. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Plaintiff filed a sur-reply without leave of the Court, which violates Chambers Rule 4.F.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties, Original Document was returned to the filer. Signed by the chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 05/21/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rejected Document
Friday, May 17, 2024
20 20 respm Response - Other Mon 05/20 10:35 AM
Plaintiff's Response to Reply re19 In Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice. filed by Marian Anthony. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 9 pgs respm Reply - Other Mon 05/13 4:21 PM
REPLY - Other re17 Response in Opposition to Motion,13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Daniel Segura.(Duke, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
18 18 21 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 05/01 3:19 PM
Plaintiff Marian Anthony Response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice re13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Marian Anthony.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
17 17 44 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/01 3:09 PM
RESPONSE to Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant re13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Marian Anthony.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
16 16 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 05/01 2:45 PM
Plaintiff Marian Anthony's Response to Defendant's Daniel Segura's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice Re13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Marian Anthony.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, April 19, 2024
15 15 20 pgs respm Response - Other Mon 04/22 11:53 AM
Plaintiff Marian Anthony Response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice. Filed by Marian Anthony.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
14 14 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 04/22 11:48 AM
Plaintiff Marian Anthony's Response to Defendant's Daniel Segurra's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice. RE:13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Marian Anthony.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, April 11, 2024
13 13 3 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 04/11 12:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by Daniel Segura.(Duke, Carmela) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Judge Daniel Segura,
Att: 2 18 pgs Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibit A,
Att: 3 2 pgs Declaration of Carmela E. Duke,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents Thu 04/04 3:19 PM
Order: 1.Terminating as Moot Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.7 ); and2.Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Electronically (ECF No.10 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 04/03/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Thu 04/04 3:03 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting re10 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents, from Plaintiff Marian Anthony. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Non-Compliance: Plaintiff did not comply with the requirements of the motion as laid out in the ECF Policies and Procedures manual, Section 2.b. Other: Duplicate Motion previously filed on 03/13/2024 (ECF No.4 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed on behalf of Judge Cynthia Bashant Law Clerk on 04/04/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
10 10 motion Leave to Electronically File Documents Tue 04/02 10:47 AM
MOTION: Request for Electronic File Documents by Marian Anthony. (mjw)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/02 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marian Anthony. Daniel Segura served. (mjw)
Related: [-]
8 8 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/02 10:09 AM
First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunction against Daniel Segura, filed by Marian Anthony. (mjw) Modified on 4/2/202 ** No amended Summons issued per chambers. ** (mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
7 7 3 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 03/28 10:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Daniel Segura.(Duke, Carmela)Attorney Carmela E. Duke added to party Daniel Segura(pty:dft)** QC Email sent. Multi-Pleading Filing entered as One Pleading ** (mjw).** Modified on 3/28/2024 to withdraw QC email.** (mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Judge Daniel Segura,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits A-D,
Att: 3 2 pgs Declaration of Carmela E. Duke,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Tue 03/19 2:59 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting re4 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents, from Plaintiff Marian Anthony. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Plaintiff did not comply with the requirements of the motion as laid out in the ECF Policies and Procedures manual, Section 2.b.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties, Original Document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 03/19/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stricken Document
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/13 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marian Anthony. Daniel Segura served. (mjw)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Leave to Electronically File Documents Wed 03/13 10:52 AM
MOTION for Electronic Filed Documents filed by Marian Anthony. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/11 12:14 PM
ORDER Denying Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No.1 ) Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 03/11/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 1:49 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (rxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Daniel Segura ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 151970.), filed by Marian Anthony. The new case number is 3:24-cv-458-BAS-SBC. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt