Hall v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-cv-00071
Lead case: 1:22-cv-00071
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca R Pallmeyer |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01966 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:24-cv-00537 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whitney Hall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 4:40 PM CST |
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:24-cv-537-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (adh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 3/8/2024.] | |
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |