New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:24-cv-01755
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
C'H'C'M' LLC
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/02 10:03 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry10 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/2/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/01 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Derrick Anderson with Prejudice (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 06/13 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 06/13 4:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the Notice of Settlement9 , the initial conference previously scheduled for 6/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak has been adjourned sine die. The parties are to file a stipulation of discontinuance within 30 days - 7/15/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/13/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/09 1:38 PM
STIPULATION Further Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by C'H'C'M' LLC by C'H'C'M' LLC (Dholandas, Shashi)
Related: [-]
order Order to Answer Thu 05/09 2:43 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER re8 answer due 6/17/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/9/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/04 11:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 6/21/2024 @ 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:45 AM. Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/4/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 04/02 12:04 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by C'H'C'M' LLC (Dholandas, Shashi)
Related: [-]
order Order to Answer Tue 04/02 3:33 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Stipulation at6 is So Ordered. Answer due 5/16/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/2/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/26 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Anderson. C'H'C'M' LLC served on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/11 9:32 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 03/11 9:32 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to C'H'C'M' LLC. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against C'H'C'M' LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17650192 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons