Greer v. Harreld et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew W Mcfarland |
Referred: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00118 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Robert Dunn
|
|
Defendant
Edward Bryan Greer
|
|
Defendant
Martha Greer
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Conroy Greer
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Hall
|
|
Defendant
Susan Harreld
|
|
Defendant
Michael Harreld, Sr.
|
|
Defendant
David Ison
|
|
Defendant
Nickolas McCoy
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Tacket
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Eric Greer, I
10218 SW Village Pkwy
Port Saint Lucie, FL 34987 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Strike
Wed 04/24 10:30 AM
Cross MOTION to Strike Tackett Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Steven Eric Greer, I. (Greer, Steven) MOTION MOOT - THIS CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO THE EASTERN DIVISION AND SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED ONLY IN CASE NUMBER 2:24-CV-01237 (km) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/18 9:19 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern Division of this Court at Columbus; (2) Plaintiff's motion for ECF filing rights (Doc.2 ) is GRANTED; (3) Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall electronically file a First Amended Complaint that fully complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8, that eliminates redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous matter, and that separately identifies the exhibits to the complaint as attachments to the complaint in the electronic record; (4) Upon transfer to the Columbus division, the Clerk of Court shall note the relatedness of Plaintiff's previously filed case, No. 2:22-cv-3443-SDM-CMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/18/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional
Mon 03/18 9:30 AM
Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to the Eastern Division at Columbus as case number 2:24-cv-01237. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:24-cv-01237. (km) |
||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/11 8:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Edward Bryan Greer, Sarah Conroy Greer, Cynthia Hall, Susan Harreld, Michael Harreld, Sr. and mailed back to the plaintiff for service. (bjc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/11 8:02 AM
MOTION for ECF Filing Rights by Plaintiff Steven E. Greer. (bjc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/11 7:57 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Robert Dunn, Edward Bryan Greer, Martha Greer, Sarah Conroy Greer, Cynthia Hall, Susan Harreld, Michael Harreld, Sr., David Ison, Nickolas McCoy, Christopher Tacket, filed by Steven E. Greer. (bjc) (bjc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Box Label | ||
Att: 3 (3/11/2024) Filing Fee Receipt | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/11 7:58 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 100003574 (bjc) Modified File Date on 3/11/2024 (bjc) |