|
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/25 7:07 AM
Reset Deadlines: J & P Sommer Burritos, LLC answer due 5/21/2024; Jason Sommer answer due 5/21/2024; Pamela Sommer answer due 5/21/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/24 3:13 PM
STIPULATION by Defendants J & P Sommer Burritos, LLC, Jason Sommer, Pamela Sommer. (Harrelson, William)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/10 1:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant J & P Sommer Burritos, LLC. J & P Sommer Burritos, LLC served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/09 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Pamela Sommer. Pamela Sommer served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/05 1:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jason Sommer. Jason Sommer served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 03/28 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING BY CLERK - Certified mail service has been done by the Clerk, U.S. District Court on March 28, 2024. A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the following locations: J&P Sommer Burritos, LLC c/o Stat Agent Pamela Sommer 6825 McMaken Road Covington, Ohio 45318 (9589 0710 5270 0683 1886 41), Jason Sommer 6825 McMaken Road Covington, Ohio 45318 (9589 0710 5270 0683 1886 65), and Pamela Sommer 6825 McMaken Road Covington, Ohio 45318 (9589 0710 5270 0683 1886 58). (pb)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/27 8:31 AM
Summons Issued as to J & P Sommer Burritos, LLC, Jason Sommer, and Pamela Sommer. (srb)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/26 2:33 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Filippelli, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons Form,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Form
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/08 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9858286), filed by Diane Fambro. (Filippelli, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|