New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:24-mc-00106
CauseMotion to Quash
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Mon 04/22 1:09 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of Delaware acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-mc-00202, filed on 4/22/2024. (rju)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Fri 03/22 12:43 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Transfer Case. As discussed in the conference held on March 21, 2024, the Court finds that there are exceptional circumstances that warrant transferring the pending motion to quash to the issuing court pursuant to Rule 45(f). The motion to transfer at Dkt. 13 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this matter to Judge Jennifer L. Hall in the District of Delaware, to be resolved as part of the ongoing proceedings in Robocast, Inc. v. Netflix, Inc., No. 22-305-JLH (D. Del.). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/22/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Mon 04/22 10:25 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Delaware. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/03 2:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arun Subramanian: Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2024. Mariel Talmage, Steven Rizzi, and Grant Johnson present for Plaintiffs. Tara Elliott, Alessandra Schaszberger, Ashley Fry, and Rachel Cohen present for Defendant. Laurie Charrington, representative for Defendant, present. (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
33 33 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 03/20 11:54 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt . Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 03/20 11:52 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt . Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc., Netflix Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:31 .(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Seal Wed 03/20 11:47 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Reply addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Steven J. Rizzi dated 03/20/2024. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/20 11:33 PM
NOTICE of Lead Trial Counsel Designation. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/20 8:42 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Tara D. Elliott dated March 20, 2024 re:26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaw . Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/20 3:31 PM
ORDER: The Court will hold a remote hearing in this matter on Thursday, March 21, 2024, at 11:00 AM. The parties should join by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 651 999 139, followed by the pound (#) sign. Lead counsel in both the Delaware matter and this one must attend. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/20/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 03/20 2:58 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Alessandra M. Schaszberger in Support of Cross-Motion to Transfer Under Rule 45(f) and in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 [re-filed to include Exhibit 11] in Support re:13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) .. Document filed by Netflix Inc., Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:14 .(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/8/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 3/12/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Torres Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit 5 - 12/6/2009 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 6 - Robocast Privilege Log,
Att: 6 Exhibit 7 - 9/29/2008 Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 8 - 12/23/1999 Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 9 - Image of Check,
Att: 9 Exhibit 10 - 2/1/2010 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit 11 - Sofer Deposition Transcript,
Att: 11 Exhibit 17 - 3/1/2024 S. Moore Letter,
Att: 12 Exhibit 19 - Robocast Excel Spreadsheet
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/19 8:04 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt,13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Grant L. Johnson dated March 19, 2024. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Johnson, Grant)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 7:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grant Lawrence Johnson on behalf of Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Johnson, Grant)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/19 7:16 PM
NOTICE of Certificate of Service re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt,3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,2 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Netflix, Inc. co The Corporation Trust Company Affirmation of Service, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Latham Watkins LLP Affirmation of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Richards Layton Finger PA Affirmation of Service).(Talmage, Mariel)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 03/19 3:55 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion to Seal. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/19/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariel Talmage on behalf of Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Talmage, Mariel)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/19 10:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting8 Motion for Alessandra M. Schaszberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/19/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/19 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting7 Motion for Kimberly Q. Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/19/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/19 10:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting6 Motion for Tara D. Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/19/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/19 8:54 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Tara D. Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/19 8:57 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Kimberly Q. Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096743. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/19 8:59 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Alessandra M. Schaszberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
18 18 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 03/18 11:46 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Alessandra M. Schaszberger in Support of Cross-Motion to Transfer Under Rule 45(f) and in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 in Support re:13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) .. Document filed by Netflix Inc., Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:14 .(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/8/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 3/12/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Torres Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit 5 - 12/6/2009 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 6 - Robocast Privilege Log,
Att: 6 Exhibit 7 - 9/29/2008 Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 8 - 12/23/1999 Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 9 - Image of Check,
Att: 9 Exhibit 10 - 2/1/2010 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit 17 - 3/1/2024 S. Moore Letter,
Att: 11 Exhibit 19 - Robocast Excel Spreadsheet
17 17 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 03/18 11:36 PM
DECLARATION of Alessandra M. Schaszberger in Support of Cross-Motion to Transfer Under Rule 45(f) and in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 // in Support re:13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) .. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/8/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 3/12/2024 A. Schaszberger Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Torres Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 2022 Medium Article,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 12/6/2009 Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Robocast Privilege Log,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 9/29/2008 Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 12/23/1999 Email,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Image of Check,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - 2/1/2010 Email,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Sofer Deposition Transcript,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 2/21/2024 A. Schaszberger Email,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - 2/23/2024 A. Fry Email,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Pimentel Affidavit,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Granados Affidavit,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - 2/26/2024 A. Schaszberger Email,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - 3/1/2024 S. Moore Letter,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Netflix First Set of RFPs,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Robocast Excel Spreadsheet
16 16 25 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/18 11:11 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) . and in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 . Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/18 11:09 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) . and in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 . Document filed by Netflix Inc., Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:14 .(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Seal Mon 03/18 10:43 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Tara D. Elliott dated March 18, 2024. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Transfer Case Mon 03/18 10:40 PM
CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case Under Rule 45(f) . Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/18 8:06 PM
NOTICE of Lead Trial Counsel Designation. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/18 8:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 7:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley M. Fry on behalf of Netflix Inc...(Fry, Ashley)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 7:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Lauren Weiner Cohen on behalf of Netflix Inc...(Weiner Cohen, Rachel)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 7:49 PM
MOTION for Alessandra M. Schaszberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Schaszberger, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Alessandra M. Schaszberger in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 7:38 PM
MOTION for Kimberly Q. Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096743. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Li, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Kimberly Q. Li in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 7:25 PM
MOTION for Tara D. Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29096712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Netflix Inc...(Elliott, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Tara D. Elliott in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Monday, March 11, 2024
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/11 12:19 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/11 12:21 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/08 6:54 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Fri 03/08 6:53 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 23 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/08 6:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt . Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc...(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 03/08 6:47 PM
DECLARATION of Steven J. Rizzi, Esq. in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt. Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena on SJR, #2 Exhibit B - Email thread, #3 Exhibit C - 2024 3 8 Signed Torres Decl ISO Motion to Quash w. Exs1-2, #4 Exhibit D - Netflix Notice of Subpoena_SoferHaroun, #5 Exhibit E - Netflix Notice of Subpoena_Sofer, #6 Exhibit F - Netflix Notice of Subpoena_Antrim, #7 Exhibit G - 2023.08.29 - Transcript of Discovery Conference (Full)).(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Quash Fri 03/08 6:22 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Delaware. Other Court Case Number: 22-cv-305. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29057047)Document filed by Steven J Rizzi, Robocast Inc..(Rizzi, Steven)
Related: [-]