American Financing Corporation v. Sobo et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00651 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:20 AM MDT |
Defendant
Liberty Financing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Babajigde Jay Sobo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Financing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Thu 05/01 8:12 AM
ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference . The deadline to file dispositive motions was set for April 30, 2025 and none have been filed. Therefore, a Final Pretrial Conference is set for June 24, 2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews. By June 17, 2025, the parties shall file a proposed final pretrial order and email a WORD version to crews_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov . Parties shall refer to this Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases when preparing the proposed final pretrial order. Parties should be prepared to set a trial date within one to two months out from this conference. Lead counsel who will try the case must be in attendance. SO ORDERED by Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/1/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, ) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/31 1:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's28 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Written Discovery Requests by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 01/31/2025. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants are due no later than February 12, 2025 . Text Only Entry (sjeff) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 01/30 4:23 PM
MEMORANDUM: re28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Written Discovery Requests filed by American Financing Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/30/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, ) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Written Discovery Requests by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Himmel, Janet) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/10 4:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 01/10/2025. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' first set of written discovery on or before January 30, 2025. Text Only Entry(sjeff) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 01/10 2:20 PM
MEMORANDUM: re25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Written Discovery filed by American Financing Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. by Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/10/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, ) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Written Discovery by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Himmel, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATED Protective ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 6/18/2024.(angar, ) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 06/17 11:56 AM
MEMORANDUM: re22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Financing Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/17/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, ) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation.(Himmel, Janet) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/13/2024. Discovery due by 3/28/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2025. (trvo, ) |
|
20 | 20
![]() MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/13/2024. FTR: C205. (trvo, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan H. Smithers on behalf of American Financing CorporationAttorney Evan H. Smithers added to party American Financing Corporation(pty:pla) (Smithers, Evan) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Himmel, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 11:28 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, ) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 04/30 9:44 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-651-SKC . (Text Only Entry) (angar, ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation All parties do not consent.. (Himmel, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Scott E. Brenner added to party Liberty Financing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott E. Brenner added to party Babajigde Jay Sobo(pty:dft) by Liberty Financing, LLC, Babajigde Jay Sobo.(Brenner, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/8/2024. Consent Form due by 4/29/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/6/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2024, at 10:15 AM MDT in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service Amended Certificate of Service for Plaintiff's Notices of Entry of Appearance (Dkts. #008 &009) by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Himmel, Janet) |
|
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Financing Corporation. Babajigde Jay Sobo served on 3/19/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (Dawson, Micah) |
|
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Financing Corporation. Liberty Financing, LLC served on 3/19/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (Dawson, Micah) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Janet M. Himmel on behalf of American Financing CorporationAttorney Janet M. Himmel added to party American Financing Corporation(pty:pla) (Himmel, Janet) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Micah David Dawson on behalf of American Financing Corporation (Dawson, Micah) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (sphil, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS REQUEST as to Babajigde "Jay" Sobo re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Dawson, Micah) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS REQUEST as to Liberty Financing, LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation. (Dawson, Micah) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons issued. (ykare, ) Modified on 3/11/2024 fix date on docket (ykare, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 03/11 8:40 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose Text Only Entry (ykare, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE re1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff American Financing Corporation (Dawson, Micah) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Liberty Financing, LLC, Babajide "Jay" Sobo (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9579541)Attorney Micah David Dawson added to party American Financing Corporation(pty:pla), filed by American Financing Corporation.(Dawson, Micah) |