Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10371 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc.
21730 Nordhoff St
Chatsworth, CA 91311-5826 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
59 | 59
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/26 4:51 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Michael Molloy In Support of Continued Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc. . (Ure, Thomas) |
|
58 | 58
notice
Notice
Fri 04/26 2:13 PM
Notice Supplemental Notice Re: Availability of ZoomGov Audio and Video For Remote Appearance Filed by Debtor Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc. . (Ure, Thomas) |
|
57 | 57
notice
Notice
Fri 04/26 2:12 PM
Notice Of Continued Hearing on Debtor's Motion For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 4001(b) Filed by Debtor Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc. . (Ure, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/24 5:41 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Hearing to be held on 04/30/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for16 , (JC) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
notice
Notice
Mon 04/22 4:06 PM
Notice Amended Notice Of Continued Hearing on Debtor's Motion For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 4001(b) Filed by Debtor Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc. . (Ure, Thomas) |
|
55 | 55
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/22 10:59 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing time is listed on this pleading. The hearing on 4/24/24 is scheduled for 1:30 pm THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING TIME. (JC) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
53 | 53
misc
Supplemental
Fri 04/19 4:37 PM
Supplemental Declaration of Tammy Navarro In Support of Continued Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Socal Climate Control & Mechanical, Inc.. (Ure, Thomas) |