New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-01782
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Jad Abi-Samra
Defendant
Aytan Benaderet
Defendant
Clear Street
Defendant
Erin Person
Plaintiff
Raghavendran Shankar
662 N Milwaukee Ave Unit
Chicago, IL 60642


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Thursday, May 16, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 05/16 10:43 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3-4. Mailed to: Raghavendran Shankar 662 N Milwaukee Ave Unit Chicago, IL 60642. (vn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
4 4 order Judgment Tue 05/14 5:48 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT For the reasons stated in the May 10, 2024, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/10/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 05/14 5:42 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Plaintiff submitted this complaint by email on March 7, 2024. He had 21 days to submit the $405.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this court or ask that the fees be waived by submitting an application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Plaintiff did not pay the fees or submit an IFP application. Accordingly, by order dated April 2, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiff, within 30 days, to submit an IFP application or pay the fees. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an IFP application or paid the fees. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. §§ 1914, 1915. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/10/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 04/03 9:30 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Raghavendran Shankar 662 N Milwaukee Ave Unit Chicago, IL 60642. (sha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application Tue 04/02 12:09 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/2/2024. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/2/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/24) (asg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit IFP application
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Tue 03/26 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Jad Abi-Samra, Aytan Benaderet, Clear Street, Erin Person. Document filed by Raghavendran Shankar. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Employment Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Separation Agreement and Release
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/08 11:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]