New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-01815
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Val Group International Inc.
Plaintiff
Edery Herrera
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 E. 18 Street
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/21 8:42 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Val Group International Inc.. Document filed by Edery Herrera. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/26 6:39 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:8 Status Report filed by Edery Herrera. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 1, 2024, is ADJOURNED to June 12, 2024, at 4:10 P.M. The parties shall file their preconference materials by June 5, 2024. ( Initial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/26/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 04/25 3:07 PM
STATUS REPORT. Re: Dkt. 7 Document filed by Edery Herrera..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/22 5:56 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that if Plaintiff has been in communication with Defendant, then the parties shall file the joint status letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than April 24, 2024. If Plaintiff has not been in communication with Defendant, Plaintiff shall file a status letter regarding Plaintiffs efforts to serve Defendant and request an adjournment of the initial conference as soon as possible and no later than April 24, 2024. ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 24, 2024, is adjourned to May 1, 2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/22/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/12 4:20 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, andthe time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/12/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Edery Herrera..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Val Group International Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/11 10:02 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/11 10:03 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/11 10:05 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/11 10:05 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/08 7:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/08 7:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Val Group International Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edery Herrera..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/08 6:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Val Group International Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29057142)Document filed by Edery Herrera..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]