Edgar Martinez D.O. Inc., a California corporation
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barry Russell |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11828 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Debtor
Edgar Martinez D.O. Inc., a California corporation
3512 E Florence Ave # 102-103
Huntington Park, CA 90255-5900 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Rosendo Gonzalez (TR)
Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. 530 S. Hewitt Street, Suite 148
Los Angeles, CA 90013 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 03/09/2024 12:01 AM PST |
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 03/08 5:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-11828] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56590682. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 03/08 5:01 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Edgar Martinez D.O. Inc., a California corporation (Williams, J) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 03/08 7:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |