California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:24-cv-01362
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Maximum Games, LLC
Represented By
Padmini Cheruvu
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Andrew Scott MacKay
Donahue Fizgerald LLP
contact info
Nathan Desai
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Microids, SA
Represented By
Tahereh Mahmoudian
Ropers Majeski Kohn Bentley
contact info
Defendant
Maximum Games, LLC
Represented By
Padmini Cheruvu
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Andrew Scott MacKay
Donahue Fizgerald LLP
contact info
Nathan Desai
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Mediator
Dria Fearn
U.S. District Court Northern District of CA 1301 Clay St., 400 South
Oakland, CA 94612
Plaintiff
Microids, SA
Represented By
Tahereh Mahmoudian
Ropers Majeski Kohn Bentley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
54 54 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/30 10:55 AM
ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Stipulation of Dismissal or Status Report due by 6/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/30/2025. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
53 53 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 2:30 PM
NOTICE by Maximum Games, LLC of Settlement (Joint Notice) (MacKay, Andrew)
Related: [-]