California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00413
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Yumili Flores (1)
Represented By
Kenan Gultekin
Law Office Of Kenan Gultekin
contact info
Jory A. Burks
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Mireya Rodarte (2)
Represented By
Gerard Jeffrey Wasson
Law Office Of Gerard J. Wasson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Bianca Calderon-Penaloza
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Oct 02 2024
JUDGMENT as to Mireya Rodarte (2). Count(s) 1s, Custody of the BOP for a term of Time Served. Supervised Release for a term of 2 years. $100 assessment imposed. No fine. Count(s) 1, Government's oral motion to dismiss remaining count is granted. Signed by Judge John A. Houston. (aef)
GPO Mar 10 2025
JUDGMENT as to Yumili Flores (1). Count(s) 1s, Custody of the BOP for a term of 33 months. Supervised Release for a term of 3 years. $100 assessment waived. No fine. Count(s) 1, Government's oral motion to dismiss underlying Information is granted. Signed by Judge John A. Houston. (aef)

Docket last updated: 03/10/2024 12:33 AM PST
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
Arrest of Yumili Flores, Mireya Rodarte. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yumili Flores, Mireya Rodarte.(mef) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yumili Flores, Mireya Rodarte: Initial Appearance set for 2/8/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Bianca Calderon-Penaloza appearing for USA. (Calderon-Penaloza, Bianca)Attorney Bianca Calderon-Penaloza added to party USA(pty:pla) (stn). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Yumili Flores(1), Mireya Rodarte(2) held on 2/8/2024. Financial Affidavit filed as to Yumili FLores(1). Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Yumili Flores (1). Oral proffer confirmed as to Mireya Rodarte(2). Appoined attorney Gerard Jeffrey Wasson (n/a)for Mireya Rodarte(2). Bond set as to Yumili Flores (1) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 5% cash deposit and Mireya Rodarte (2) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 5% cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/22/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 3/7/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. ) (Interpreter Elizabeth Varela). (CD# 2/8/2024 SBC 24-1:2:09-2:44;2:09-2:38). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Lisa Muloma FD-S/A, Sheyda Khonji FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Yumili Flores, Mireya Rodarte (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Mireya Rodarte (2) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 5% cash deposit... Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/8/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Yumili Flores (1) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 5% cash deposit... Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/8/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yumili Flores (cxl) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Yumili Flores: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/8/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Mireya Rodarte: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/8/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jory A. Burks appearing for Yumili Flores (Burks, Jory)Attorney Jory A. Burks added to party Yumili Flores(pty:dft) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Yumili Flores (Burks, Jory) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 MINUTE ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Yumili Flores. The Court has been notified of an actual conflict in this case. As such, the Court relieves Federal Defenders Office and appoints CJA Attorney Kenan Gultekin for Yumili Flores. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/12/2024. (no document attached) (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
14 14 P/S Bond Filed as to Mireya Rodarte in amount of $20,000, Receipt # 151370. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/13/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Mireya Rodarte.) (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
15 15 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Mireya Rodarte re14 Bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/13/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
Thursday, February 15, 2024
16 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Discovery by USA as to Yumili Flores, Mireya Rodarte. (Calderon-Penaloza, Bianca) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to 1 FRRA, Unopposed by Yumili Flores.(Gultekin, Kenan) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel
Friday, February 16, 2024
18 18 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Yumili Flores. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/7/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/16/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
19 19 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Mireya Rodarte. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/7/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/16/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Granting17 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Yumili Flores (1). Bond modified as follows: $20,000 P/S + 1 FRRA (defendant's sister) + 5% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/16/2024.(dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 P/S Bond Filed as to Yumili Flores in amount of $20,000, Receipt # 151426. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/20/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Yumili Flores.) (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
22 22 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Yumili Flores re21 Bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/20/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
23 23 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Calderon-Penaloza, Bianca) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
24 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY granting16 Motion for Protective Order as to Yumili Flores (1), Mireya Rodarte (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 03/05/2024.(ggv) [3:24-mj-00435-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
25 25 INFORMATION as to Yumili Flores (1) count(s) 1, Mireya Rodarte (2) count(s) 1. (bas1)
Related: [-]
26 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to Yumili Flores (1) Count 1 and Mireya Rodarte (2) Count 1 held on 3/7/2024. Defendants present on bond; Not Guilty pleas entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 3/27/2024 11:30 AM before Judge John A. Houston. (CD# 3/7/2024 SBC 208-228). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Kenan Gultekin, CJA; Gerard Wasson, CJA). (dls)
Related: [-]