Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-04025
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Jalen Latimer (1)
Represented By
Scott Lauer
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristen M. Noto
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2024 5:53 AM EDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal as to Jalen Latimer by USA. (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting1 Motion to Seal as to Jalen Latimer (1) (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT as to Jalen Latimer (1).(King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Gerega,
Att: 2 JS45
Att: 4 (2/12/2024) Affidavit (redcacted) (King, Dawn). (Entered: 02/09/2024
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Jalen Latimer; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]