Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00012
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 3:04 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeffrey Quinn McCarther
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Johnson A Mangol (1)
Terminated: 02/20/2024


Docket last updated: 03/10/2024 4:27 AM CDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Johnson A Mangol (1). (Nolte, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Johnson A Mangol. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/23/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nolte, Melissa)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Johnson A Mangol. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/23/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nolte, Melissa)
Related: [-]