Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00612
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Feb 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 1:39 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Juan Pablo Arroyave-Cuerco (1)
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Represented By
Rosario T. Ruiz
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2024 5:32 AM CDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 Petty Documents as to Juan Pablo Arroyave-Cuerco (epda)
Related: [-]