New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:24-cv-01828
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Barstool Sports, Inc.
Represented By
Barry Werbin
Herrick, Feinstein Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Global Weather Productions, LLC
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info
James H. Freeman
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/28 9:02 PM
ORDER: The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Dkt. No. 23. The Court takes no position regarding the substance of the parties' agreements. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/28/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 08/28 12:39 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/30 2:57 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc...(Werbin, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/16 1:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Barstool Sports, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Video Screenshot,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Infringement Screenshot
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/25 12:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc...(Werbin, Barry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Mon 06/24 4:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from James H. Freeman dated 6/24/24 re: Video Screenshot. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/24 1:05 PM
ORDER As stated on the record at the June 24, 2024 conference, the deadline for Defendant to answer the complaint is extended to June 25, 2024. SO ORDERED. Barstool Sports, Inc. answer due 6/25/2024. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/24/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Case Management Plan Mon 06/24 1:04 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Settlement discussions have taken place. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 days. The Court will hold a status conference on December 23, 2024. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the status conference will take place by telephone. Motions due by 1/5/2025. Deposition due by 10/22/2024. Fact Discovery due by 10/22/2024. Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2024. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/24/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 06/27 5:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/24/2024. Answer ddl extended (See Order at dkt. no. 18). (Court Reporter Present) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 06/21 11:19 AM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Conference re:15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Conference to Appear Telephonically on 6/24 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from James H. Freeman dated 6/20/24. Application granted. The conference scheduled for June 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 15. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/20/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Conference Thu 06/20 1:34 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Conference to Appear Telephonically on 6/24 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from James H. Freeman dated 6/20/24. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 06/17 5:12 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Letter
Thursday, April 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/02 2:53 PM
ORDER denying11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Barry Werbin dated April 2, 2024.. Application denied. Defendant is incorrect that the current deadline for it to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is May 3, 2024. The Court's March 12, 2024 order set the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint as the date of the initial pretrial conference, which is June 24, 2024. Dkt. No. 7. The parties are directed to read all Court orders. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 11. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/2/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/02 11:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Barry Werbin dated April 2, 2024. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc...(Werbin, Barry)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 7:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Barstool Sports, Inc. answer due 6/24/2024. (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/01 6:20 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc...(Werbin, Barry)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/01 6:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Werbin on behalf of Barstool Sports, Inc...(Werbin, Barry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/15 2:54 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barstool Sports, Inc. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks, Managing Agent. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/13 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/12/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 03/12 10:29 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 10:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barstool Sports, Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 03/12 10:18 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 03/12 10:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 03/12 10:18 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Mon 03/11 11:07 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/11 11:06 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barstool Sports, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/11 11:04 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29059815)Document filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Video,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Video