New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-01772
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
K&D Liquors, Inc.
Represented By
Vinay Patel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/16 9:58 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/16/2024 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/13 2:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 08/22 4:02 PM
ORDER: granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Plaintiff is directed to file a a stipulation of dismissal by 09/18/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 8/22/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/19 2:48 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal (with consent) by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order(Other) Wed 07/17 10:13 AM
ORDER: In light of the parties' notice of settlement11 the date to file an answer in this matter is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 08/19/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 7/17/2024. Modified on 7/17/2024 (ASS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/15 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 29, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 06/29 10:00 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (ONF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/17 4:32 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by K&D Liquors, Inc.. (Patel, Vinay)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/17 4:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Answer due 7/17/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/17/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order(Other) Tue 06/11 4:28 PM
ORDER: The initial conference previously scheduled for 7/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak is adjourned sine die. An adjourned date is forthcoming. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/11/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/17 8:55 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Answer due 6/17/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/17/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/16 6:02 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by K&D Liquors, Inc.. (Patel, Vinay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/17 12:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/16/2024 @ 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:15 AM . Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/17/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/17 12:33 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by K&D Liquors, Inc.. (Patel, Vinay)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vinay Patel on behalf of K&D Liquors, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Patel, Vinay)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/17 12:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Answer due 5/17/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/17/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/29 9:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Anderson. K&D Liquors, Inc. served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 1:59 PM
Summons Issued as to K&D Liquors, Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/11 1:57 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 03/11 1:56 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against K&D Liquors, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17653202 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/11 1:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]