Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:24-bk-12298
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Claims Deadline:May 20, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Nov 08, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Sano Racing Stables, LLC
1318 Crossbill Ct
Weston, FL 33327-2376
Represented By
Jacqueline Calderin, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
229 229 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 04/30 3:18 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Jesse R Cloyd Related [+]. (Cloyd, Jesse)
Related: [-] 228 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
228 228 order Compromise Controversy Order Wed 04/23 10:49 AM
Order Granting Motion To Compromise Controversy Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] # 227