Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-70112

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 7:24-ap-07008
Nature of Suit66 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:May 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
PO BOX 1709
ROANOKE, VA 24008
Represented By
Internal Revenue Service
contact info
Plaintiff
Heidi Renata Nichols
911 Dominion Lane
Salem, VA 24153
Represented By
Tonya Janney
Tonya L. Janney, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/01 12:36 PM
Adversary Case 7:24-ap-7008 Closed (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/16 10:46 AM
Disposition of Adversary 7:2024-ap-7008-pmb Agreed Order Discharging Tax Liability . Case to Be Closed if Applicable 04/30/2024. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/12 11:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Tonya Janney on behalf of Heidi Renata Nichols Related [+]. (Janney, Tonya)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 03/12 8:12 AM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff Defendant Motion or Answer due by 4/16/2024. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 10:24 AM
Adversary case 24-07008 Complaint by Tonya Janney on behalf of Heidi Renata Nichols against Internal Revenue Service. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00. AP Service Due 04/30/2024. Nature of Suit: (66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims)) (Janney, Tonya)
Related: [-]