Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-00247
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:48 AM EDT
defendant
Barbara R. Miller
plaintiff
Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Michelle Thurber Czapski
Bodman Plc (troy)
contact info
Emily Jenks
Bodman Plc (troy)
contact info
Erica Jaye Shell
Bodman Plc (detroit)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 20, 2024
13 13 order Judgment Mon 05/20 2:39 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 05/20 2:26 PM
ORDER granting11 motion for default judgment; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/17 4:38 PM
MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant Barbara R. Miller by plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company; (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 service Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/17 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company re Default (Entry of)8 (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 05/16 12:01 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to file request for default judgment by 5/30/2024 or show cause; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 05/06 3:07 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michelle Thurber Czapski on behalf of plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company (Czapski, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
8 8 order Default (Entry of) Thu 05/02 1:45 PM
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Barbara R. Miller (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
7 7 motion Application for Entry of Default Wed 05/01 12:35 PM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Barbara R. Miller (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/19 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company re complaint,1 , Summons Issued4 (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/19 4:03 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Barbara R. Miller served on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024 as taken from6 (eod) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (eod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/13 11:30 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerber Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Western and Southern Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Western and Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Gerber Life Insurance Company (Shell, Erica) Modified text on 3/13/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 3:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Barbara R. Miller (ems)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Mon 03/11 3:05 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 03/11 2:52 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Barbara R. Miller filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company (Shell, Erica) Modified text on 3/11/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 03/11 1:10 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7316380 (Shell, Erica)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 03/11 1:17 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Jenks on behalf of plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company (Jenks, Emily)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Mon 03/11 2:53 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Barbara R. Miller (proposed summons has not been provided by filing party) (ems)
Related: [-]