New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-01778
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Los Paisanos Meat Market Inc.
Represented By
Douglas E. Rowe
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 13, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/13 11:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re13 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Derrick Anderson. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/13/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/12 1:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
12 12 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 08/15 10:16 AM
MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: An in-person initial conference was held before Magistrate Judge Eshkenazi. Counsel for both parties were present. The parties expressed their a desire to reach an amicable resolution of this case. This case is referred to the EDNY Mediation Panel. For assistance with any questions about the mediation process or the selection of a mediator, Counsel should contact the Courts ADR Department at (718)-613-2578. The parties are directed to select a mediator by 08/28/2024 and should complete mediation by 10/14/2024. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status letter after completing mediation by 10/21/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 misc Case Management Statement Fri 08/09 4:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 08/09 2:22 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's 07/15/2024 Order, the Parties were directed to file a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling order no later than 08/07/2024. To date, the Parties have not filed the Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Parties are directed to file their Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 08/12/2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 8/9/2024. (AS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 07/15 1:04 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/11 10:44 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Lara K. Eshkenazi. (ONF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 07/05 11:29 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 4:17 PM
ORDER. An initial conference is set for 7/17/2024 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, the parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Civil Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 7/10/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/1/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/31 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Los Paisanos Meat Market Inc. (Rowe, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Rowe, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/03 2:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Los Paisanos Meat Market Inc.. All Defendants. (Rowe, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Rowe on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Rowe, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Los Paisanos Meat Market Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/11 2:22 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 03/11 2:14 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against Los Paisanos Meat Market Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17653769 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/11 2:11 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]