North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 4:24-cv-00037
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Domtar Paper Company, LLC
Represented By
John Timothy Jeffries
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
MOR PPM, Inc.
Represented By
James A. Roberts, III
Lewis & Roberts, PLLC
contact info
John Timothy Jeffries
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Adcock
Represented By
Charles Raymond Hardee
Hardee Massey And Blodgett
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/09 1:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Domtar Paper Company, LLC, MOR PPM, Inc. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/09 4:15 PM
Order - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated within 45 days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before October 24, 2024. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/9/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/22 10:25 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 5/29/2025. Mediation Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Scott Hart is appointed as mediator. Motions due by 7/31/2025. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/22/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
12 12 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Thu 05/16 4:18 PM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Domtar Paper Company, LLC, MOR PPM, Inc.. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/25 11:41 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Joint Report and Plan due by 5/30/24. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/25/24. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
utility Case Selected for Mediation Thu 04/25 11:12 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 8:25 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Daniel Adcock (Hardee, Charles)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/21 8:19 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Charles Raymond Hardee on behalf of Daniel Adcock. (Hardee, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
8 8 notice Notice-other Tue 03/12 2:33 PM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Charles R. Hardee of Hardee, Massey & Blodgett, LLP at 202 E. Arlington Blvd., Suite W, Greenville, NC 27858 mailed via US Mail on March 12, 2024. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/12 11:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MOR PPM, Inc.. (Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 11:26 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by MOR PPM, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMCOR Group, Inc. for MOR PPM, Inc.. (Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Roberts, III on behalf of MOR PPM, Inc.. (Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 03/11 2:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Domtar Paper Company, LLC. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 2:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John Timothy Jeffries on behalf of Domtar Paper Company, LLC. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 03/11 2:15 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Domtar Paper Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Domtar Corporation for Domtar Paper Company, LLC. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/11 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MOR PPM, Inc., Domtar Paper Company, LLC from Edgecombe County Superior Civil, case number 24-CVS-29. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7514831), filed by MOR PPM, Inc., Domtar Paper Company, LLC. (Jeffries, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demand letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Documents