Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00046
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Sandra McCoy
Defendant
Pamela S Ternes
Defendant
Phillip M. Ternes
Plaintiff
Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company
Represented By
Lauren H. Navarro
Dentons Us Llp - Kansas City
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 order Judgment - Consent (Case) Mon 08/12 4:42 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/12/24. (MRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 motion Approve Consent Judgment Fri 08/09 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment (Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment) by Plaintiff Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company.(Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 04, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/04 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company. Phillip M. Ternes served on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/04 12:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company. Pamela S Ternes served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/04 12:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company. Sandra McCoy served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 03/12 2:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company, PMA Companies, Inc., Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Old Republic International Corporation.. (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Notice of Process Server Mon 03/11 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company Process Server: D&B Legal Services (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Notice of Process Server Mon 03/11 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company Process Server: D&B Legal Services (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 03/11 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company Process Server: D&B Legal Services (Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10486787, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company.(Navarro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - policy,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form Original Filing For,
Att: 4 Summons Phillip M. Ternes,
Att: 5 Summons Sandra McCoy,
Att: 6 Summons Pamela S. Ternes
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 03/11 3:18 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Lauren Navarro. (MRS)
Related: [-]