New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Case #: 1:24-cv-01839
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Canal Sound and Light, Inc.
Represented By
David Stein
Stein & Nieporent LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Beauchamp
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 05/15 1:18 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at ECF No. 16 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per the Court's Individual Rule No. 7, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 5/15/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/13 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/13 5:56 PM
ORDER: The parties' deadline to submit a joint letter was May 11, 2024. The parties have not done so. I am sua sponte extending the deadline nunc pro tunc until 9:00 AM on May 15, 2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 5/13/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 04/22 5:02 PM
ORDER: This action is scheduled for a telephonic Initial Case Management Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on, May 22, 2024 at 10:00 AM. Counsel for the parties are directed to call my Microsoft Teams conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Access Code 698 117 044 #. Initial Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/22/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/22 12:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Canal Sound and Light, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 04/19 4:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause served on Canal Sound and Light, Inc. on 4/19/24. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/18 2:28 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is hereby Ordered To Show Cause why an order should not be issued pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 instructing Plaintiff to seek default judgment against Defendant for failure to defend this action. This Order To Show Cause may be satisfied by filing a written response to the complaint by May 2, 2024 along with a declaration explaining why Defendant did not timely respond to the complaint. Plaintiff is directed to mail by April 19, 2024 a copy of this Order To Show Cause to Defendant at its principal place of business, identified in the Complaint as 319 Canal Street, New York, NY. Plaintiff is directed to file confirmation of such mailing on the docket by April 19, 2024. Defendant is warned that failure to respond to this Order To Show Cause may result in an order instructing Plaintiff to seek a default judgment against Defendant for failure to defend this action. Canal Sound and Light, Inc. answer due 5/2/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/18/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/27 3:35 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Canal Sound and Light, Inc. served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024. Service was accepted by Jeffery Kwan, manager. Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 5:42 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Canal Sound and Light, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/21 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of Canal Sound and Light, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 10:47 AM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within 30 days of the service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. In their discussions, the parties should consider whether plaintiff has satisfied the threshold requirement of standing. See, e.g., Calcano v. Swarovski N. Am. Ltd., 36 F.4th 68, 77-78 (2d Cir. 2022); Harty v. W. Point Realty, Inc., 28 F.4th 435, 443-44 (2d Cir. 2022). To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the Districts Court-annexed mediation program or before the undersigned would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 45 days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must submit a joint letter informing the Court whether the parties have settled. If the parties do not reach a settlement, the parties shall, in their joint letter, request that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation, or (2) set a date for a settlement conference, or (3) proceed with an initial case management conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 3/13/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Case Redesignation Wed 03/13 8:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/13 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave no longer referred to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/12 3:46 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. SO ORDRED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/12/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canal Sound and Light, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 03/12 11:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 03/12 11:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 03/12 11:36 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/11 4:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Canal Sound and Light, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/11 4:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 03/11 4:08 PM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Canal Sound and Light, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29062979)Document filed by Kevin Beauchamp..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]