Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00597
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Central Transport LLC
Represented By
Talley Ray Parker
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lafereo Bennett
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Michaela Dew
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Hamburg
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Christal Kelly
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Travies Mitchell
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrius Richardson
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
James Roque
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Reco Winston
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Johnson
Represented By
David B Joeckel, Jr
Joeckel Law Office
contact info
Caitlin Taylor Davis
Joeckel Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/04 9:51 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning 11/17/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Brantley Starr. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/6/2025. Discovery due by 5/23/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Motions due by 6/20/2025. Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 11/3/2025. Status Report due by 6/13/2025. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 3/4/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 motion Continue Thu 01/09 4:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue and EXTENSION OF DEADLINES filed by Central Transport LLC (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
16 16 trial Designation of Experts Tue 12/24 9:13 AM
Designation of Experts by Central Transport LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 trial Designation of Experts Mon 11/25 5:38 PM
Designation of Experts by Lafereo Bennett. (Joeckel, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
14 14 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/16 3:20 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/16/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/15 2:44 PM
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Central Transport LLC (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 adr Designation of Mediator Wed 10/09 10:50 AM
Designation of Mediator by Central Transport LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/27 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning on 8/4/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Brantley Starr. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/10/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2024. Discovery due by 2/24/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2024. Motions due by 3/24/2025. Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 7/21/2025. Status Report due by 3/17/2025. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/27/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Wed 08/14 1:22 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Lafereo Bennett. (Joeckel, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Thu 08/01 4:09 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2024. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/1/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 04/04 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Transport LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/04 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Central Transport LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Talley Ray Parker added to party Central Transport LLC(pty:dft) (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements Tue 03/12 2:44 PM
Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Joeckel, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 10:30 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michaela Dew, Brandon Hamburg, Christal Kelly, Travies Mitchell, Darrius Richardson, James Roque, Reco Winston. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Joeckel, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Central Transport LLC. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 order Electronic Standing Order - Specific Requirements for Judge Starr Tue 03/12 9:12 AM
Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at:[LINK:Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements.] To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 3/11/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Starr Tue 03/12 9:09 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Lafereo Bennett. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14455946) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Joeckel, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Cover Sheet